EP1799980 - CONSTRUCTION FOR AN ENGINE EXHAUST SYSTEM COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DONALDSON COMPANY, INC. 1400 West 94th Street P.O. Box 1299 Minneapolis, MN 55440-1299 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states DONALDSON COMPANY, INC. 1400 West 94th Street, P.O. Box 1299 Minneapolis, MN 55440-1299 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAIRCLOTH, Arthur, E., Jr. Box 176 Kellogg, IA 50135 / US | 02 /
FORTUNA, Matthew, P. 2017 Royale Drive Eagan, MN 55122 / US | 03 /
BELISLE, John, I. 21825 Inga Avenue Hampton, MN 55031 / US | 04 /
HOVDA, Allan, T. 13967 Yosemite Ct. Savage, MN 55378 / US | 05 /
KUNDERT, Josh, J. 685 East Burnsville Parkway Burnsville, MN 55337 / US | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Speiser, Dieter K. Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | Speiser, Dieter K. Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05804115.3 | 08.09.2005 | [2007/26] | WO2005US31848 | Priority number, date | US20040608266P | 08.09.2004 Original published format: US 608266 P | US20040608422P | 08.09.2004 Original published format: US 608422 P | US20040626823P | 09.11.2004 Original published format: US 626823 P | US20050662904P | 17.03.2005 Original published format: US 662904 P | [2007/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006029201 | Date: | 16.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1799980 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F01N7/18, F01N3/035, F01N3/021, F01N3/08, F16L23/08, F01N3/02, F01N7/14, F16L59/14, F02B77/11 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
F01N13/143 (EP,US);
F01N13/009 (EP,US);
F01N13/0097 (EP,US);
F01N13/14 (EP,US);
F01N13/1805 (EP,US);
F01N13/1844 (EP,US);
F01N3/0211 (EP,US);
F01N3/0237 (EP,US);
F01N3/035 (EP,US);
F01N3/0892 (EP,US);
F01N3/28 (EP,US);
F01N3/2864 (EP,US);
F01N3/2871 (EP,US);
F01N3/2875 (EP,US);
F16L23/08 (EP,US);
F16L23/162 (EP,US);
F16L59/12 (EP,US);
F16L59/14 (EP,US);
F16L59/147 (EP,US);
F16L59/184 (EP,US);
F16L9/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONSTRUKTION FÜR EINE MOTORABGASSYSTEMKOMPONENTE | [2007/26] | English: | CONSTRUCTION FOR AN ENGINE EXHAUST SYSTEM COMPONENT | [2007/26] | French: | CONSTRUCTION D'UN COMPOSANT D'UN SYSTEME D'ECHAPPEMENT D'UN MOTEUR | [2007/26] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 20.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/40] | 07.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US6632406 (MICHELIN JOEL [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,7,13-18,20,22 * column 2, line 51 - column 7, line 3 * * figure - * [Y] 19,21; | [XY]DE29503550U (ZEUNA STAERKER KG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,7,12-15 * page 5 - page 7 * * figure 1 * [Y] 6; | [Y]EP0396151 (PLATZER SCHWEDENBAU GMBH [DE]) [Y] 6,19,21 * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 31 * * figure 2 *; | [X]DE2751918 (BOTHWELL BRUCE E) [X] 23,25-28 * page 7 - page 34 *; | [X]EP0974741 (SJM COMPANY LIMITED [KR]) [X] 23,24,28 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0038] *; | [X]JPS59153916 ; | [X]US2003159436 (FOSTER MICHAEL RALPH [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,11-18,20,22 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0029] * * figures 4,5 *; | [A]DE3815148 (EBERSPAECHER J [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0142633 (EMINOX LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3512580 (UERUENDUEL CELAL [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003108457 (GAULT ANTHONY JOHN [GB], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850109), vol. 009, no. 003, Database accession no. (M - 349), & JP59153916 A 19840901 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KK) [X] 23,24 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * |