EP1778635 - ISOINDOLINE COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/18] | ISOINDOLINE COMPOUNDS AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THE SAME | ||
[2011/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CELGENE CORPORATION 7 Powder Horn Drive Warren, NJ 07059 / US | [2007/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MULLER, George, W. P.O. Box 3688 Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067 / US | 02 /
MAN, Hon-Wah 27 Grant Way Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [2010/36] |
Former [2007/18] | 01 /
MULLER, George, W. 250 Windmill Court Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | ||
02 /
MAN, Hon-Wah 27 Grant Way Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | Representative(s) | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05804207.8 | 27.07.2005 | [2007/18] | WO2005US26680 | Priority number, date | US20040900270 | 28.07.2004 Original published format: US 900270 | [2007/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006025991 | Date: | 09.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1778635 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1778635 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/46 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
C07D209/48 (EP,KR,US);
C07D209/46 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4035 (KR);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/18] | Extension states | AL | 23.02.2007 | BA | 23.02.2007 | HR | 23.02.2007 | MK | 23.02.2007 | YU | 23.02.2007 | Title | German: | ISOINDOLIN-VERBINDUNGEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN | [2011/02] | English: | ISOINDOLINE COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USES | [2011/02] | French: | COMPOSÉS ISOINDOLINIQUES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2011/02] |
Former [2007/18] | ISOINDOLINZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | ||
Former [2007/18] | ISOINDOLINE COMPOUNDS AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THE SAME | ||
Former [2007/18] | COMPOSES D'ISOINDOLINE ET METHODES DE PRODUCTION ET D'UTILISATION DESDITS COMPOSES | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 16.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.12.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.04.2011 | BE | 27.04.2011 | CY | 27.04.2011 | CZ | 27.04.2011 | DK | 27.04.2011 | EE | 27.04.2011 | FI | 27.04.2011 | HU | 27.04.2011 | LT | 27.04.2011 | LV | 27.04.2011 | NL | 27.04.2011 | PL | 27.04.2011 | RO | 27.04.2011 | SE | 27.04.2011 | SI | 27.04.2011 | SK | 27.04.2011 | TR | 27.04.2011 | BG | 27.07.2011 | IE | 27.07.2011 | LU | 27.07.2011 | GR | 28.07.2011 | CH | 31.07.2011 | LI | 31.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | IS | 27.08.2011 | PT | 29.08.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
TR | 27.04.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
LU | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
LU | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
LU | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 27.04.2011 | |
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 27.04.2011 | |
PT | 29.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0025777 (CELGENE CORP [US]) [X] 1-29 * Examples *; | [X]WO0134606 (CELGENE CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-30 * Examples *; | [X]WO0145702 (CELGENE CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-29 * Examples *; | [Y]WO2004060313 (CELGENE CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-29 * Examples *; | [PY]WO2004080423 (CELGENE CORP [US], et al) [PY] 1-29 * Examples *; | [PY]WO2004080422 (CELGENE CORP [US], et al) [PY] 1-29 * Examples *; | [A] - MULLER G W ET AL, "Thalidomide analogs and PDE4 inhibition", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, OXFORD, GB, (19981006), vol. 8, no. 19, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 2669 - 2674, XP004139598 [A] 1-29 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(98)00475-2 |