EP1802304 - CILOSTAZOL-CONTAINING PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION BASED ON PARTICLES OF LESS THAN 50 MICROMETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ranbaxy Laboratories Limited Plot No. 90, Sector-32 Gurgaon Haryana 122001, Delhi / IN | [2007/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURPANI, Deepak C-213, Lajpat Nagar, Part-1 New Delhi 110024 / IN | 02 /
BHATTI, Ashima House 6C, GH-16, Mansa Devi Complex, Sector 5 Panchkula, Haryana 122001 / IN | [2007/27] | Representative(s) | Cronin, Brian Harold John CRONIN Intellectual Property Chemin de Précossy 31 1260 Nyon / CH | [2007/27] | Application number, filing date | 05804696.2 | 16.09.2005 | [2007/27] | WO2005IB02750 | Priority number, date | INDE17702004 | 17.09.2004 Original published format: IN DE17702004 | [2007/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006030301 | Date: | 23.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1802304 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4709, A61K9/14 | [2007/27] | CPC: |
A61K31/4709 (EP,US);
A61K9/146 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT CILOSTAZOL AUF DER BASIS VON TEILCHEN MIT EINER GRÖSSE VON WENIGER ALS 50 MIKROMETERN | [2007/27] | English: | CILOSTAZOL-CONTAINING PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION BASED ON PARTICLES OF LESS THAN 50 MICROMETERS | [2007/27] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE CONTENANT DU CILOSTAZOL, A BASE DE PARTICULES D'UNE TAILLE INFERIEURE A 50 MICROMETRES | [2007/27] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/27] | 21.06.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 27.07.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 01.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/41] | 14.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/41] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1407785 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4-9,12,16-18,20,22,24-26 * paragraphs [0172] , [0219] *; | [X]WO2004062571 (TEVA PHARMA [IL], et al) [X] 1,4-9,12,16-18,20,22,24 * page 9, line 9 - page 9, line 19 *; | [X]US2003166937 (MENDELOVICI MARIOARA [IL], et al) [X] 1,4-9,12,16-18,20,22,24 * paragraph [0038] *; | [A]WO9621448 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-26 * claims 1,9 * * example 2 *; | [E]US2005255155 (SEN NILENDU [IN], et al) [E] 1,4-8,12-18,20,22,24 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0028] * * claims 1-15 * |