EP1742974 - MULTI-MODAL VINYL ESTER RESINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Drexel University 32nd and Chestnut Streets Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19104 / US | For all designated states THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as represented by the SECRETARY OF THE ARMY Army Research Laboratories, 2800 Powder Mill Road Adelphi, MD 20783-1197 / US | [2007/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALMESE, Guiseppe, Raffaello 2 Cove Court Hainesport, NJ 08036 / US | 02 /
LA SCALA, John, Joseph 22 Forsythia Lane Bear, DE 19701 / US | 03 /
SANDS, James, Matthew 801 Karen Drive Kingsville, MD 21087-1023 / US | [2007/21] |
Former [2007/03] | 01 /
PALMESE, Guiseppe, Raffaello 2 Cove Court Hainesport, NJ 08036 / US | ||
02 /
LA SCALA, John, Joseph 2207-K Byrnes Court Bel Air, MD 21015 / US | |||
03 /
SANDS, James, Matthew 801 Karen Drive Kingsville, MD 21087-1023 / US | Representative(s) | Dunleavy, Kevin James, et al Mendelsohn Dunleavy, P.C. p/o De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Dunleavy, Kevin James, et al Mendelsohn, Drucker and Dunleavy, P.C. p/o De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2013/03] | Dunleavy, Kevin James, et al Mendelsohn, Drucker & Associates, P.C. p/o De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2007/03] | Dunleavy, Kevin James Knoble & Yoshida LLC, p/o De Vries & Metman, Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 05804814.1 | 06.05.2005 | [2007/03] | WO2005US16005 | Priority number, date | US20040569379P | 07.05.2004 Original published format: US 569379 P | [2007/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005118657 | Date: | 15.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1742974 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1742974 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08F220/26, C08F220/62, C08F220/28, C08F290/06, C08G59/14, C08L63/10 | [2013/03] | CPC: |
C08F220/26 (EP,US);
C08F220/286 (EP,US);
C08F220/62 (EP,US);
C08F290/064 (EP,US);
C08G59/1466 (EP,US);
C08L63/10 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F290/064, C08F220/62 (EP,US);
C08L63/10, C08L2666/14 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2010/07] | C08F20/06, C08F12/02, C08F283/01, C08L63/10 | ||
Former IPC [2008/38] | C08F20/06, C08F12/02, C08F283/01 | ||
Former IPC [2007/03] | C08F20/44 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/03] | Title | German: | MULTIMODALE VINYLESTERHARZE | [2007/03] | English: | MULTI-MODAL VINYL ESTER RESINS | [2007/03] | French: | RESINES MULTIMODALES VINYLESTER | [2007/03] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2006 | Search fee paid | 06.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/03] | 25.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.05.2005 | AT | 31.07.2013 | BE | 31.07.2013 | BG | 31.07.2013 | CY | 31.07.2013 | CZ | 31.07.2013 | DK | 31.07.2013 | EE | 31.07.2013 | ES | 31.07.2013 | FI | 31.07.2013 | IT | 31.07.2013 | LT | 31.07.2013 | MC | 31.07.2013 | NL | 31.07.2013 | PL | 31.07.2013 | RO | 31.07.2013 | SE | 31.07.2013 | SI | 31.07.2013 | SK | 31.07.2013 | TR | 31.07.2013 | GR | 01.11.2013 | IS | 30.11.2013 | PT | 02.12.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 06.05.2005 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 31.07.2013 | |
PT | 02.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3637618 (MAY CLAYTON A) [A] 1-16 * column 8, lines 6-10; example I; claims 1-13 *; | [A]US4254351 (SMITH JAMES D B, et al) [A] 1-16 * column 10, lines 25-35; examples 1,2 * * column 9, lines 64-68; claim 1 *; | [X]US4347343 (BREWBAKER JAMES L) [X] 1,18 * column 4, lines 61-68 *; | [A]EP0336360 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP]) [A] 1-16 * page 3, lines 26,27,44,45; example 3; claim 1 ** page 4, line 5.6 * | International search | [X]US4359370 (DE LA MARE HAROLD E, et al); | [X]US5523337 (BANERJEE KRISHNA G [US], et al) | by applicant | US6583218 | - JOURNAL OF APPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 72, page 647 | - J.S. ULLET, R.P. CHARTOFF, POLYMER ENGINEERING AND SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 35, no. 13, page 1086 | - A.R. SIEBER, C.D. GUILEY, A.J. KINLOCH, M. FERNANDO, E.P.L. HEIJNSBROCK, Toughened Plastics I/: Novel Approaches in Science and Engineering, Advances in Chemistry Series 252, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1996), pages 151 - 160 |