EP1766091 - BIOMARKERS FOR MONITORING INHIBITION OF IMPDH PATHWAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VERTEX PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED 130 Waverly Street Cambridge, MA 02139-4242 / US | [2007/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAIN-PANDEY, Jugnu 21 Eisenhower Avuen Natick, MA 01760 / US | 02 /
HARDING, Matthew, W. 4 Chestnut Street Acton, MA 01720 / US | 03 /
RAMACHANDRAN, Ravi 425 Great Elm Way Acton, MA 01718 / US | 04 /
BOTFIELD, Martyn 363 Marlborough Street Boston, MA 02115 / US | [2007/13] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2007/13] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05804844.8 | 27.05.2005 | [2007/13] | WO2005US18551 | Priority number, date | US20040575076P | 27.05.2004 Original published format: US 575076 P | [2007/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005117943 | Date: | 15.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1766091 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, G01N33/53, C07H21/02 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6837 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/13] | C12Q1/68, C07H21/02, G01N33/53 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/13] | Extension states | AL | 18.12.2006 | BA | 18.12.2006 | HR | 18.12.2006 | LV | 18.12.2006 | MK | 18.12.2006 | YU | 18.12.2006 | Title | German: | BIOMARKER ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER HEMMUNG DES IMPDH-WEGES | [2007/13] | English: | BIOMARKERS FOR MONITORING INHIBITION OF IMPDH PATHWAY | [2007/13] | French: | BIOMARQUEURS POUR LE SUIVI D'INHIBITION DE LA VOIE DE L'INOSINE MONOPHOSPHATE DESHYDROGENASE (IMPDH) | [2007/13] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2006 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 19.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/25] | 04.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004009495 (O'MALLEY SHAWN [US], et al) [Y] 27-53 * paragraphs [0022] , [0034] - [0044] - [0058] - [0063] - [0090] * * claims 30-43 *; | [A]WO03089903 (SCRIPPS RESEARCH INST [US], et al) [A] * claims 1-6,13-15 * * page 5, line 14 - page 7 * | [X] - ZHANG YUHONG ET AL, "Ribavirin treatment up-regulates antiviral gene expression via the interferon-stimulated response element in respiratory syncytial virus-infected epithelial cells.", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (200305), vol. 77, no. 10, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 5933 - 5947, XP002513718 [X] 1-55 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.77.10.5933-5947.2003 | [Y] - PING CHEN ET AL, "Identification of Novel and Potent Isoquinoline Aminooxazole-Based IMPDH Inhibitors", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, GB, (20030101), vol. 13, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 1345 - 1348, XP002488849 [Y] 27-53 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(03)00107-0 | [Y] - JAIN J ET AL, "VX-944: A SPECIFIC, REVERSIBLE IMPDH INHIBITOR WITH POTENT ANTI-PROLIFERATIVE EFFECTS IN HUMAN TUMOR CELL LINES DERIVED FROM HEMATOLOGICAL MALIGNANCIES", BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, (20021116), vol. 100, no. 11, ISSN 0006-4971, page ABSTR.NO.2248, XP001190825 [Y] 27-53 * the whole document * | [Y] - OHNO R ET AL, "PREDICTION OF RESPONSE TO IMATINIB BY CDNA MICROARRAY ANALYSIS", SEMINARS IN HEMATOLOGY, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (20030401), vol. 40, no. 2, SUPPL. 02, ISSN 0037-1963, pages 42 - 49, XP009059427 [Y] 27-53 * the whole document * | [Y] - CERTA U ET AL, "HIGH DENSITY OLIGONUCLEOTIDE ARRAY ANALYSIS OF INTERFERON-ALPHA2A SENSITIVITY AND TRANSCRIPTIONAL RESPONSE IN MELANOMA CELLS", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, LONDON, GB, (20010706), vol. 85, no. 1, ISSN 0007-0920, pages 107 - 114, XP008016089 [Y] 27-53 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1054/bjoc.2001.1865 | [Y] - LOS G ET AL, "Using mRNA expression profiling to determine anticancer drug efficacy", CYTOMETRY, ALAN LISS, NEW YORK, US, (20020101), vol. 47, no. 1, ISSN 0196-4763, pages 66 - 71, XP002321902 [Y] 27-53 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cyto.10037 | [Y] - SOTIRIOU CHRISTOS ET AL, "Gene expression profiles derived from fine needle aspiration correlate with response to systemic chemotherapy in breast cancer", BREAST CANCER RESEARCH, CURRENT SCIENCE, LONDON, GB, (20020320), vol. 4, no. 3, ISSN 1465-5411, page R3, XP021020763 [Y] 27-53 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/bcr433 | International search | [X]US6331396 (SILVERMAN ROBERT H [US], et al); | [X]US6040138 (LOCKHART DAVID J [US], et al); | [X]US6344316 (LOCKHART DAVID J [US], et al) |