EP1789625 - PAIRED WARP TRIPLE LAYER FORMING FABRICS WITH OPTIMUM SHEET BUILDING CHARACTERISTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.01.2017 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 22.02.2017 [2017/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORP. 1373 Broadway Albany, New York 12204 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/22] | For all designated states ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORP. 1373 Broadway Albany New York 12204 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIN, Chad, A. W6007 Strawflower Drive Appleton, Wisconsin 54915 / US | 02 /
QUIGLEY, Scott 1203 Hunter Crossing Bossier City, LA 71111 / US | [2008/02] |
Former [2007/22] | 01 /
MARTIN, Chad, A. 2011 Dreamfield Lane Menasha, WI 54952 / US | ||
02 /
QUIGLEY, Scott 1203 Hunter Crossing Bossier City, LA 71111 / US | Representative(s) | Bugnion Genève Bugnion S.A. Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Route de Florissant 10 Case Postale 375 1211 Genève 12 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/22] | Bugnion Genève Bugnion S.A. P.O.Box 375 1211 Geneva 12 / CH | Application number, filing date | 05804934.7 | 01.08.2005 | [2007/22] | WO2005US27749 | Priority number, date | US20040911091 | 04.08.2004 Original published format: US 911091 | [2007/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006015377 | Date: | 09.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1789625 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | D21F1/00 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
D21F1/0045 (EP,US);
D21F1/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DREISCHICHTIGES, GEPAARTE KETTFÄDEN AUFWEISENDES FORMIERSIEB MIT OPTIMALEN BLATTBILDUNGSEIGENSCHAFTEN | [2007/22] | English: | PAIRED WARP TRIPLE LAYER FORMING FABRICS WITH OPTIMUM SHEET BUILDING CHARACTERISTICS | [2007/22] | French: | TOILES DE FORMATION A COUCHE TRIPLE DE FILS DE CHAINE EN PAIRES PRESENTANT DES CARACTERISTIQUES DE CONSTRUCTION DE FEUILLE OPTIMALES | [2007/22] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 12.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/08] | 21.09.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/08] | 10.10.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5238536 (DANBY ROGER [CA]) [Y] 22,47 * column 6, lines 18-28 ** figures 2C,3C *; | [XY]WO2004038094 (ALBANY INT CORP [US]) [X] 1-21,23-46,48-50 * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 27 * * page 7, lines 4-11 * * page 8, line 6 - page 9, line 30 * * page 14, line 4 - page 15, line 9 * * claims 1-21 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 22,47 |