EP1806053 - HERBICIDE COMPOSITIONS FOR UPLAND FARMING AND CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2008 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIHON NOHYAKU CO., LTD. 2-5, Nihonbashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8236 / JP | [2007/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMATA, Shuji, C/O. LTD., RESEARCH CENTER 345, Oyamada-cho, Kawachinagano-shi Osaka 586-0094 / JP | 02 /
NATSUME, Bunji, C/O. LTD., RESEARCH CENTER 345, Oyamada-cho, Kawachinagano-shi Osaka 586-0094 / JP | [2007/28] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/28] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05805134.3 | 21.10.2005 | [2007/28] | WO2005JP19413 | Priority number, date | JP20040309532 | 25.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004309532 | [2007/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006046485 | Date: | 04.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1806053 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/90, A01N33/18, A01N35/10, A01N39/02, A01N43/40, A01N43/50, A01N43/76, A01N47/12, A01N47/30, A01N47/36, A01N47/38 | [2007/28] | CPC: |
A01N43/90 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/90, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/90, A01N47/30, A01N33/18, A01N47/36, A01N43/90 (EP,US);
A01N43/90, A01N47/36, A01N47/10, A01N47/30, A01N33/18, A01N39/02, A01N37/50, A01N41/10, A01N43/50, A01N43/653, A01N43/90, A01N43/40, A01N43/82, A01N43/08 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERBIZIDZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR DIE BERGLANDWIRTSCHAFT UND BEKÄMPFUNGSVERFAHREN | [2007/28] | English: | HERBICIDE COMPOSITIONS FOR UPLAND FARMING AND CONTROL METHOD | [2007/28] | French: | COMPOSITIONS HERBICIDES POUR L'AGRICULTURE DE MONTAGNE ET PROCÉDÉ DE LUTTE CONTRE LES MAUVAISES HERBES | [2007/28] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2007 | Translation filed | 20.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/28] | 09.07.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004029060 (NIHON NOHYAKU CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JPH0687835 (ROHM & HAAS) |