EP1922622 - INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, SELF-DIAGNOSIS METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASIO COMPUTER CO., LTD. 6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8543 / JP | [2008/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASAYAMA, Yoshinori c/o Intellectual Property Dpt Casio Computer Co. Ltd. Hamura R&D Center 2-1, Sakae-cho 3chome, Hamura-shi Tokyo 205-8555 / JP | 02 /
MIDOROGI, Satomi c/o Intellectual Property Dpt Casio Computer Co. Ltd. Hamura R&D Center 2-1, Sakae-cho 3chome, Hamura-shi Tokyo 205-8555 / JP | [2012/01] |
Former [2008/21] | 01 /
ASAYAMA, Yoshinori c/o Intellectual Property Dpt Casio Computer Co. Ltd. Hamura R&D Center 2-1, Sakae-cho 3chome Hamura-shi Tokyo 205-8555 / JP | ||
02 /
MIDOROGI, Satomi c/o Intellectual Property Dpt Casio Computer Co. Ltd. Hamura R&D Center 2-1, Sakae-cho 3chome Hamura-shi Tokyo 205-8555 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/21] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05805420.6 | 01.11.2005 | [2008/21] | WO2005JP20401 | Priority number, date | JP20050256515 | 05.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005256515 | [2008/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007029350 | Date: | 15.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1922622 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1922622 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/32 | [2008/21] | CPC: |
G06F11/321 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/47] |
Former [2008/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, SELBSTDIAGNOSEVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2008/21] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, SELF-DIAGNOSIS METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2008/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATION, PROCEDE D'AUTO-DIAGNOSTIC, ET PROGRAMME | [2008/21] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/21] | 29.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.06.2011 | 17.06.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5119489 (BOND ARTHUR L [US], et al) [A] 1-18* column 7, line 3 - line 38; figure 5 *; | [X]US5649094 (HAYASHI TOSHIHIDE [JP], et al) [X] 1,9,10 * column 10, line 54 - column 12, line 14; figures 5,6 * |