EP1978099 - ANTIBACTERIAL SUBSTANCE DM0507 AND UTILIZATION OF THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AHC Co., Ltd. 343-1, Koaigi-machi Maebashi-shi Gunma 371-0831 / JP | For all designated states AIM Asset Management Co., Ltd. Dabinchi-kudan 6F 3.2.5, Kudanika Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-0073 / JP | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states AIM Asset Management Co., Ltd. Dabinchi-kudan 6F 3.2.5, Kudanika Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-0073 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMASHITA, Naomi c/o AHC Co., Ltd 343-1, Koaigi-machi Maebashi-shi Gunma 371-0831 / JP | 02 /
IIZUKA, Takeru c/o AHC Co., Ltd 343-1, Koaigi-machi Maebashi-shi Gunma 371-0831 / JP | 03 /
NAKAE, Taiji 570-3, Awakubo Isehara-shi Kanagawa 259-1113 / JP | 04 /
SATAKE, Sachiko 3-23-2101, Sakae-cho Takasaki-shi Gunma 370-0841 / JP | [2008/41] | Representative(s) | Hartz, Nikolai, et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Hartz, Nikolai, et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/41] | Hartz, Nikolai, et al Wächtershauser & Hartz Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05805421.4 | 04.11.2005 | [2008/41] | WO2005JP20318 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007052356 | Date: | 10.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1978099 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12P1/04, C07G11/00 | [2008/41] | CPC: |
C12P1/04 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07G11/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/41] | Title | German: | ANTIBAKTERIELLE SUBSTANZ DM0507 UND DEREN NUTZUNG | [2008/41] | English: | ANTIBACTERIAL SUBSTANCE DM0507 AND UTILIZATION OF THE SAME | [2008/41] | French: | SUBSTANCE ANTIBACTERIENNE DM0507 ET SON UTILISATION | [2008/41] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2008 | Translation filed | 13.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 13.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 21.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/33] | 27.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5549890 (KUBO KAZUHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-5 * column 2, lines 47-49 * * column 5, lines 24-36 * * column 8, line 7 * [Y] 1-6; | [X]US6677143 (SUMI HIROYUKI [JP]) [X] 1,5,6 * column 12, lines 1-16 * * column 12, lines 37-47 * | [X] - TORSTEN STEIN, "Bacillus subtilis antibiotics: structures, syntheses and specific functions", MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY, (20050501), vol. 56, no. 4, doi:10.1111/j.1365-2958.2005.04587.x, ISSN 0950-382X, pages 845 - 857, XP055002233 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2958.2005.04587.x | [XY] - C. D. MCKEEN ET AL, "Production and Partial Characterization of Antifungal Substances Antagonistic to Monilinia fructicola from Bacillus subtilis.", PHYTOPATHOLOGY, (19860101), vol. 76, pages 136 - 139, XP055002250 [X] 1,2,4,6 * the whole document * [Y] 1-6 | [X] - J. BECHARD ET AL, "Isolation and Partial Chemical Characterization of an Antimicrobial Peptide Produced by a Strain of Bacillus subtilis", J. AGRIC.FOOD CHEM., (19980101), vol. 46, pages 5355 - 5361, XP055002257 [X] 1,2,4,6 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2004101525 (LIN ANGELINE SEAH HUAY [SG], et al); | [A]JPH11285378 (EISAI CO LTD); | [A]JPH11290063 (YUSHIRO CHEM IND); | [A]JPS50160491 ; | [A]JPS6027391 (KITASATO INST); | [A] - ZIMMERMAN S.B. ET AL, "Difficidin and oxydifficidin: novel broad spectrum antibacterial antibiotics produced by Bacillus subtilis. I. Production, taxonomy and antibacterial activity", JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOT., TOKYO, (1987), vol. 40, no. 12, pages 1677 - 1681, XP003012623 | [A] - USHIJIMA T. ET AL, "Bactillus subtilis to Bacillus natto no Seibutsugakuteki Seijo to Kokinsei ni Kansuru Kenkyu", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (1980), vol. 35, no. 4, pages 625 - 637, XP003012624 |