EP1868104 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND INFORMATION PROCESSING PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8561 / JP | For all designated states Xing Inc. 18-1 Shioiri-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 4670851 / JP | [2007/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
USHIYAMA, Kentaro c/o Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kais 15-1, Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8561 / JP | 02 /
HIBINO, Yoshihiko c/o Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kais 15-1, Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8561 / JP | 03 /
KIYOHARA, Yuji c/o Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1, Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi Nagoya-shi Aichi467 -8561 / JP | 04 /
SUZUKI, Hiroaki c/o Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1, Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8561 / JP | 05 /
IIJIMA, Koichi c/o Xing Inc. 18-1, Shioiri-cho Miz uho-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-0851 / JP | 06 /
KUDO, Tomohiro c/o National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 1-1, Higashi 1 Chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0046 / JP | 07 /
TATEBE, Osamu c/o National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 1-1, Higashi 1-Chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0046 / JP | 08 /
KODAMA, Yuetsu c/o National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology; 1-1, Higashi 1 -chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0046 / JP | 09 /
SHUDO, Kazuyuki c/o National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 1-1, Higashi 1-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0046 / JP | [2008/22] |
Former [2007/51] | 01 /
USHIYAMA, Kentaro c/o Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kais 15-1, Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8561 / JP | ||
02 /
HIBINO, Yoshihiko c/o Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kais 15-1, Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8561 / JP | |||
03 /
KIYOHARA, Yuji c/o Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1, Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi Nagoya-shi Aichi467 -8561 / JP | |||
04 /
SUZUKI, Hiroaki c/o Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1, Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8561 / JP | |||
05 /
IIJIMA, Koichi c/o Xing Inc. 18-1, Shioiri-cho Miz uho-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-0851 / JP | |||
06 /
KUDO, Tomohiro c/o National Institute of Advanced 1-1, Higashi 1 Chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0046 / JP | |||
07 /
TATEBE, Osamu c/o National Institute of Advanced I 1-1, Higashi 1-Chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0046 / JP | |||
08 /
KODAMA, Yuetsu c/o National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology; 1-1, Higashi 1 -chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0046 / JP | |||
09 /
SHUDO, Kazuyuki c/o National Institute of Advanced 1-1, Higashi 1-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0046 / JP | Representative(s) | Smith, Samuel Leonard, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | Smith, Samuel Leonard, et al J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05805936.1 | 14.11.2005 | [2007/51] | WO2005JP20876 | Priority number, date | JP20050095639 | 29.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005095639 | [2007/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006103801 | Date: | 05.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1868104 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/00 | [2007/51] | CPC: |
H04L67/104 (EP,US);
G06F16/1844 (EP,US);
H04L67/1076 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSEINRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSPROGRAMM | [2007/51] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND INFORMATION PROCESSING PROGRAM | [2007/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D' INFORMATIONS, PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT D' INFORMATIONS, PROGRAMME DE TRAITEMENT D' INFORMATIONS | [2007/51] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2007 | Translation filed | 04.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 27.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/35] | 03.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6256675 (RABINOVICH MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * column 5, paragraph l - column 6, paragraph 5 * * column 8, paragraph 3 - column 9, paragraph 2 *; | [X] - DROUGAS Y ET AL, "A fair resource allocation algorithm for peer-to-peer overlays", INFOCOM 2005. 24TH ANNUAL JOINT CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE COMPUTER AND CO MMUNICATIONS SOCIETIES. PROCEEDINGS IEEE MIAMI, FL, USA 13-17 MARCH 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20050313), vol. 4, doi:10.1109/INFCOM.2005.1498575, ISBN 978-0-7803-8968-7, pages 2853 - 2858, XP010829373 [X] 1-13 * abstract * * page 2853, column r, paragraph 2 * * page 2854, column r, paragraph l - page 2855, column r, paragraph 2 * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/INFCOM.2005.1498575 | [A] - CLARKE I ET AL, "Protecting Free Expression Online with Freenet", IEEE INTERNET COMPUTING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20020101), vol. 6, no. 1, doi:10.1109/4236.978368, ISSN 1089-7801, pages 40 - 49, XP011094110 [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 46, column r, paragraph 4 - page 5, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/4236.978368 | [A] - QIN LV ET AL, "SEARCH AND REPLICATION IN UNSTRUCTURED PEER-TO-PEER NETWORKS", CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2002 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SUPERCOMPUTING. ICS'02. NEW YORK, NY, JUNE 22 - 26, 2002; [ACM INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SUPERCOMPUTING], NEW YORK, NY : ACM, US, (20020622), vol. CONF. 16, ISBN 978-1-58113-483-4, pages 84 - 95, XP001171505 [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 91, column l, paragraph l - page 92, paragraph l * | International search | [X]JP2003280975 (KANAZAWA INST OF TECHNOLOGY); | [Y]WO02082339 (WATANABE MITSUHARU [JP]); | [Y]WO03005654 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]); | [A]JP2004220183 (SONY CORP); | [A]JP2005004615 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |