EP1815002 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF (S)-BUTAN-2-OL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/32] | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF OPTICALLY-ACTIVE ALCOHOLS | ||
[2008/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2007/32] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STÜRMER, Rainer Hauptstr. 153 67127 Rödersheim-Gronau / DE | 02 /
HAUER, Bernhard Merowingerstr.1 67136 Fussgönheim / DE | 03 /
DREW, Dejana Jasminweg 17 68167 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
BREUER, Michael Ohlystr.29 64285 Darmstadt / DE | 05 /
SCHRÖDER, Hartwig Benzstr. 4 69226 Nussloch / DE | [2007/32] | Application number, filing date | 05806536.8 | 15.11.2005 | [2007/32] | WO2005EP12234 | Priority number, date | DE20041055508 | 17.11.2004 Original published format: DE102004055508 | [2007/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006053713 | Date: | 26.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1815002 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1815002 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/16, C12N9/04, C12P41/00 | [2007/32] | CPC: |
C12P7/16 (EP,US);
Y02E50/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON (S)-BUTAN-2-OL | [2008/51] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF (S)-BUTAN-2-OL | [2008/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE (S)-BUTAN-2-OL | [2008/51] |
Former [2007/32] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG OPTISCH AKTIVER ALKOHOLE | ||
Former [2007/32] | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF OPTICALLY-ACTIVE ALCOHOLS | ||
Former [2007/32] | PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE DES ALCOOLS OPTIQUEMENT ACTIFS | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 28.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 08.04.2009 | CZ | 08.04.2009 | DK | 08.04.2009 | EE | 08.04.2009 | FI | 08.04.2009 | IE | 08.04.2009 | LT | 08.04.2009 | LV | 08.04.2009 | PL | 08.04.2009 | RO | 08.04.2009 | SI | 08.04.2009 | SK | 08.04.2009 | TR | 08.04.2009 | BG | 08.07.2009 | SE | 08.07.2009 | GR | 09.07.2009 | IS | 08.08.2009 | PT | 08.09.2009 | HU | 09.10.2009 | LU | 15.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 08.04.2009 | |
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IE | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LV | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
HU | 09.10.2009 | ||
LU | 15.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 08.04.2009 | |
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IE | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LV | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
LU | 15.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/02] | CZ | 08.04.2009 | |
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IE | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LV | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | CZ | 08.04.2009 | |
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IE | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LV | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | CZ | 08.04.2009 | |
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IE | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LV | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | CZ | 08.04.2009 | |
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IE | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LV | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | FI | 08.04.2009 | |
IE | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LV | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | FI | 08.04.2009 | |
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LV | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5763236 (KOJIMA TOMOKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 10 - line 17; tables 3,4 *; | WO0170955 [ ] (ELITRA PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | [A] - VELONIA K ET AL, "Stereospecificity of Hydrogen Transfer by the NAD<+>-linked Alcohol Dehydrogenase from the Antarctic Psychrophile Moraxella sp. TAE123", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, OXFORD, GB, (199901), vol. 9, no. 1, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 65 - 68, XP004154779 [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 66 - page 67 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(98)00678-7 | [DA] - MATSUDA T ET AL, "Asymmetric reduction of simple aliphatic ketones with dried cells of Geotrichum candidum", TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20020624), vol. 13, no. 9, ISSN 0957-4166, pages 971 - 974, XP004365921 [DA] 1-8 * abstract * * page 972, column L, paragraph L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0957-4166(02)00226-4 | [DA] - CURT W BRADSHAW ET AL, "A Pseudomonas sp. alcohol dehydrogenase with broad substrate specificity and unusual stereospecificity for organic synthesis", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, US, (19920228), vol. 57, no. 5, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 1526 - 1532, XP002024201 [DA] * abstract * * page 1527, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00031a036 | [DA] - KEINAN ET AL., "Thermostable enzymes in organic synthesis. 2.1 Asymmetric reduction of ketones with alcohol dehydrogenase from Thermoanaerobium brockii", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1986), vol. 108, pages 162 - 169, XP002371515 [DA] * abstract * * page 166, column L, line 16 - line 28 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00261a026 | [A] - "E. coli cellular proliferation protein #150.", Geneseq, (20020214), Database accession no. AAU34569, URL: EBI, XP002371518 [A] 1,8 * the whole document * | [DA] - "Alcohol dehydrogenase, propanol-preferring (EC 1.1.1.1).", UniProt, (19971101), Database accession no. P39451, URL: EBI, XP002371519 [DA] 1,8 * the whole document * | [ ] - BLATTNER F R ET AL, "THE COMPLETE GENOME SEQUENCE OF ESCHERICHIA COLI K-12", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, (19970905), vol. 277, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1453 - 1462, XP002069950 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.277.5331.1453 |