EP1776462 - MONOCOT AHASS SEQUENCES AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Plant Science GmbH Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2007/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASCENZI, Robert, A. 741 Landling Lane Cary, NC 27511 / US | 02 /
BUDZISZEWSKI, Gregory 465 Continental Drive Durham, NC 27712 / US | 03 /
KAKEFUDA, Genichi 203 Zapata Lane Chapel Hill, NC 27517 / US | 04 /
SINGH, Bijay, K. 301 Connemara Drive Cary, NC 27519 / US | [2007/17] | Representative(s) | Popp, Andreas BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX - C6 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | Popp, Andreas BASF Aktiengesellschaft Patente, Marken und Lizenzen 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05806669.7 | 04.08.2005 | [2007/17] | WO2005US27729 | Priority number, date | US20040598671P | 04.08.2004 Original published format: US 598671 P | [2007/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006015376 | Date: | 09.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1776462 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, C07H21/04, A01H5/00 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
C12Y202/01006 (EP,US);
C12N9/88 (EP,US);
C12N15/8274 (EP,US);
C12N15/8278 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MONOKOTYLEDON-AHASS-SEQUENZEN UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2007/17] | English: | MONOCOT AHASS SEQUENCES AND METHODS OF USE | [2007/17] | French: | SÉQUENCES AHASS DE MONOCOTYLÉDONE ET LEURS MÉTHODES D'UTILISATION | [2007/17] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 19.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/17] | 07.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9837206 (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-57 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0026390 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [X] 1-5,7-57 * the whole document *; | [X] - "Oryza sativa Japonica Group genomic DNA, chromosome 2, PAC clone:P0496E03.", EMBL, (20020324), Database accession no. AP004881, URL: EBI, XP002563190 [X] 1,6 * nt 40035 - 44099; gene P0496E03.9 putative acetolactate synthase small subunit * | [A] - LEE YU-TING ET AL, "Identification of the regulatory subunit of Arabidopsis thaliana acetohydroxyacid synthase and reconstitution with its catalytic subunit", BIOCHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, EASTON, PA.; US, (20010612), vol. 40, no. 23, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 6836 - 6844, XP002446217 [A] 1-57 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi002775q | International search | [X]US2001044939 (ABELL LYNN M [US], et al) |