EP1812069 - METHOD FOR TREATING HIV INFECTION THROUGH CO-ADMINISTRATION OF TIPRANAVIR AND ETRAVIRINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2007/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAFT, Michael, Friedrich Nackstrasee 10 55118 Mainz / DE | 02 /
MAYERS, Douglas Lytle, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc 900 Ridgebury Road, P.O. Box 368 Ridgefield, CT 06877-0368 / US | [2007/31] | Representative(s) | Hammann, Heinz, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD-Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Hammann, Heinz, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD-Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2007/31] | Hammann, Heinz, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 05806976.6 | 12.10.2005 | [2007/31] | WO2005US36635 | Priority number, date | US20040626134P | 08.11.2004 Original published format: US 626134 P | [2007/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006052373 | Date: | 18.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1812069 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/00, A61K31/4433, A61P31/18, A61K31/505 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K31/4433 (EP,US);
A61K31/505 (EP,US);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4433, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/505, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HIV-INFEKTIONEN MITTELS VERABREICHUNG VON TIPRANAVIR UND ETRAVIRIN | [2007/31] | English: | METHOD FOR TREATING HIV INFECTION THROUGH CO-ADMINISTRATION OF TIPRANAVIR AND ETRAVIRINE | [2007/31] | French: | METHODE DE TRAITEMENT D'INFECTION VIH PAR COADMINISTRATION DE TIPRANAVIR ET ETRAVIRINE | [2007/31] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/31] | 09.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/31] | 23.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004087139 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [X] 1-4 * Table 2: p. 36, l. 5: FLT+TPV+TMC-125 ; p. 36, l. 20: FLT+TPV+ritonavir+TMC-125 ; p. 37, l. 14: FLG+TPV+TMC-125 ; p. 38, l. 10: FLG+TPV+ritonavir+TMC-125* * Table 6: p. 54, l. 15-17: FLT+TPV+TMC-125+...; p. 56, l. 8 -9: FLT+TPV+...+TMC-125+..; p. 57, l. 18 FLG+TPV+TMC-125+...; p. 58, l. 1: FLG+TPV+TMC-125+...; p. 59, l. 10-11: FLG+TPV+...+TMC-125+..*; | [A] - DE CLERCQ ERIK, "HIV-chemotherapy and -prophylaxis: new drugs, leads and approaches", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY & CELL BIOLOGY, (200409), vol. 36, no. 9, ISSN 1357-2725, pages 1800 - 1822, XP002377245 [A] 1-4 * p. 1810, col. 1 : etravirine * * p. 1815, col .2 : tipranavir * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biocel.2004.02.015 | [T] - UCKUN F M ET AL, "Therapeutic innovations against HIV", EXPERT OPINION ON THERAPEUTIC PATENTS 2006 UNITED KINGDOM, (2006), vol. 16, no. 3, ISSN 1354-3776, pages 265 - 293, XP002377246 [T] 1-4 * Table 3 : TMC-125 * * p. 273, col. 1, 2 * * p. 276, col. 2, 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543776.16.3.265 |