EP1804687 - ENDOSCOPIC SURGICAL CLIP APPLIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2012/52] |
Former [2007/28] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group, LP 195 McDermott Road North Haven, CT 06473 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITFIELD, Kenneth, H. 335 Norton Street New Haven, CT 06511 / US | 02 /
SORRENTINO, Greg 50 Fairlawn Drive Wallingford, CT 06492 / US | [2007/28] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/28] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05807612.6 | 07.10.2005 | [2007/28] | WO2005US36214 | Priority number, date | US20040617104P | 08.10.2004 Original published format: US 617104 P | US20040617016P | 08.10.2004 Original published format: US 617016 P | [2007/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006042141 | Date: | 20.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1804687 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1804687 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/128, // A61B17/29 | [2013/39] | CPC: |
A61B17/1285 (EP,US);
A61B17/0682 (US);
A61B17/00234 (US);
A61B17/10 (US);
A61B17/105 (US);
A61B17/122 (US);
A61B17/128 (US);
A61B90/08 (US);
A61B2017/00115 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00367 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00407 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00734 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00778 (US);
A61B2017/12004 (US);
A61B2017/2923 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2926 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2927 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0803 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/38] | A61B17/10, A61B17/128, // A61B17/29 | ||
Former IPC [2011/25] | A61B17/10, // A61B17/29 | ||
Former IPC [2007/28] | A61B17/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT [2008/03] |
Former [2007/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ENDOSKOPISCHER OPERATIONSKLEMMEN-APPLIKATOR | [2007/28] | English: | ENDOSCOPIC SURGICAL CLIP APPLIER | [2007/28] | French: | APPLICATEUR DE CLIPS CHIRURGICAUX ENDOSCOPIQUES | [2013/39] |
Former [2007/28] | APPLICATEUR DE PINCES CHIRURGICALES ENDOSCOPIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 05.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/28] | 14.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP13172008.8 / EP2641548 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 12.03.2014 | IT | 12.03.2014 | [2015/18] |
Former [2014/50] | ES | 12.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4242902 (GREEN DAVID T) [A] 1-12 * figures 1,10,13 *; | [A]US4712549 (PETERS RUDOLPH [US], et al) [A] 1-12* figures 1,21 *; | [A]US5049152 (SIMON DENISE M [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * figures 5A,8.39 *; | [A]EP0769274 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * figures 8,10 *; | [A]US5938667 (PEYSER MARK S [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * columns 6,7; figures 1,3,7,8,10B,20A, * | International search | [X]US5833696 (WHITFIELD KENNETH H [US], et al) |