EP1819699 - DIAZEPINE OXAZOLIDINONES AS ANTIBACTERIAL AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC 7000 Portage Road Kalamazoo, MI 49001 / US | [2007/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERRADURA, Prudencio Sancon Pfizer Global R & D European Pharma Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent, CT13 9NJ / GB | 02 /
JOSYULA, Vara P V N Pfizer Global R & D Ann Arbor Laboratories, 2800 Plymouth Road Ann Arbor, MI 48100 / US | 03 /
RENSLO, Adam Robert Pfizer Global R & D European Pharma Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent, CT13 9NJ / US | [2007/34] | Representative(s) | Kingsbury, Oliver William Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/34] | Kingsbury, Oliver William Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05808372.6 | 17.11.2005 | [2007/34] | WO2005IB03559 | Priority number, date | US20040631475P | 29.11.2004 Original published format: US 631475 P | [2007/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006056877 | Date: | 01.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1819699 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/10, A61K31/551, A61P31/04 | [2007/34] | CPC: |
C07D413/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIAZEPINOXAZOLIDINONE ALS ANTIBAKTERIELLE MITTEL | [2007/34] | English: | DIAZEPINE OXAZOLIDINONES AS ANTIBACTERIAL AGENTS | [2007/34] | French: | UTILISATION DE DIAZEPINE OXAZOLIDINONES COMME AGENTS ANTIBACTERIENS | [2007/34] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/34] | 03.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/48] | 07.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYD]WO9924428 (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [XYD] 1-13 * Abstract; claims, in particular claim 1, R3 = (b) or (d); page 8, formula 9 in combination with example 2, page 15, step 2: "gave 0.15 g of the alcohol, a compound of formula 9 where R is hydrogen". *; | [YD]WO0146185 (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [YD] 1-13 * Abstract; claims, in particular claim 1, A = i, ii, iii, iv. *; | [XYD]WO03072553 (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [XYD] 1-13 * Abstract; claims, in particular claim 1, B = het or substituted het; examples. * |