EP1799689 - FURAZANO `3, 4-B ! PYRAZYNES AND THEIR USE AS ANTI-TUMOR AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compass Pharmaceuticals LLC 913 Ridge Drive Union, NJ 07083 / US | [2007/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAURES, Paul, W., Departement of Chemistry 6600 College Station, Bowdoin College Brunswick, ME 04011 / US | 02 /
JAMES, Donald, R. 533 Melinda Court El Sobrante, CA 94803 / US | 03 /
GLESS, Richard, D. 918 Rosecrest Drive Oakland, CA 94602 / US | 04 /
TRAN, Thuy 1831 Monrovia Drive San Jose, CA 95122 / US | 05 /
VERHEIJ, Herman, J. Trasmolen 4 NL-3352 AJ Papendrecht / NL | 06 /
SCHULTZ, Jan, C.C. Koekoekhof 16 NL-2496 LM The Hague / NL | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Zwicker, Jörk, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Zwicker, Jörk, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/26] | Zwicker, Jörk, et al Kanzlei Dr. Volker Vossius Geibelstraße 6 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05808436.9 | 12.10.2005 | [2007/26] | WO2005US36554 | Priority number, date | US20040618800P | 14.10.2004 Original published format: US 618800 P | [2007/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006044402 | Date: | 27.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1799689 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D498/04, A61K31/4985, A61P35/00 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
C07D498/04 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FURAZANO-`3,4-B-!-PYRAZINE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS ANTITUMORMITTEL | [2007/26] | English: | FURAZANO `3, 4-B ! PYRAZYNES AND THEIR USE AS ANTI-TUMOR AGENTS | [2007/26] | French: | FURAZANO-3,4-B ! PYRAZINES ET LEUR EMPLOI EN TANT QU AGENTS ANTITUMORAUX | [2007/26] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 09.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/50] | 05.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.03.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0244378 (CURIS INC [US], et al) [X] 23,24 * compound A, page 7 *; | [A]WO2004085409 (BIOFOCUS DISCOVERY LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,33,34 * claims 17-19,30 *; | [PX]WO2005051974 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [PX] 1-39 * the whole document *; | [PX]EP1529531 (4SC AG [DE]) [PX] 1-39 * the whole document * | [X] - STARCHENKOV I B ET AL, "CHEMISTRY OF FURAZANOÄ3,4-BÜPYRAZINES 3. METHOD FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF 5,6-DISUBSTITUTED FURAZANOÄ3,4-BÜPYRAZINES", CHEMISTRY OF HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS (A TRANSLATION OF KHIMIYA GETEROTSIKLICHESKIKH SOEDINENII), PLENUM PRESS CO., NEW YORK, NY, US, (1997), vol. 33, no. 10, ISSN 0009-3122, pages 1219 - 1233, XP009025968 [X] 23,24,26,27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02256764 | [X] - FERNANDEZ E ET AL, "Solid-phase versus solution synthesis of asymmetrically disubstituted furazano[3,4-b]pyrazines", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20020701), vol. 43, no. 27, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 4741 - 4745, XP004365869 [X] 23,24,27,31,32 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(02)00913-9 | [X] - REGISTRY, Chemical Abstracts Service, Columbus, Ohio, USA, URL: STN, XP002366583 [X] 29 * Registry numbers: 708979-46-8, 663947-57-7, 663928-35-6, 663928-34-5, 663928-30-1, 521934-58-7, 521933-81-3, 521933-97-1, 521933-55-1 * * 521933-51-7, 521933-49-3 * | by applicant | - HOROWITZ ET AL., JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 308 - 314 | - BAILAR ET AL, N. ENGL. J. MED., (1997), vol. 336, pages 1569 - 1574 |