EP1811867 - FOOD COMPOSITION COMPRISING A PROTEIN- AND A LIPID FRACTION FOR RAPIDLY ATTENUATING INFLAMMATORY RESPONSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUYER, Michael Derek Philip Gerbergaplantsoen 3 NL-6226 DR Maastricht / NL | 02 /
VRIESEMA, Adrianus Johannes Maria Fluweelmos 6 NL-3994 KR Houten / NL | 03 /
BUURMAN, Willem Andries H. Smeetstraat 19 NL-6245 GB Eijsden / NL | 04 /
GREVE, Johannes Wilhelmus Maria Bergweg 52 NL-6212 CX Maastricht / NL | 05 /
HAGEMAN, Robert Johan Joseph Hamsterlaan 12 NL-6705 CT Wageningen / NL | 06 /
HOFMAN, Zandrie Bereklauw 18 NL-6721 RH Bennekom / NL | [2007/31] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2007/31] | Swinkels, Bart Willem, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau, P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 05808543.2 | 14.11.2005 | [2007/31] | WO2005NL50040 | Priority number, date | EP20040078112 | 12.11.2004 Original published format: EP 04078112 | [2007/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006052134 | Date: | 18.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1811867 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/38, A23L1/305, A61K38/01, A61K31/661 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
A61K36/48 (EP,US);
A23L33/115 (EP,US);
A23L33/185 (EP,US);
A23L33/19 (EP,US);
A61K31/661 (EP,US);
A61K31/685 (EP,US);
A61K35/20 (EP,US);
A61K38/011 (EP,US);
A61K38/1709 (EP,US);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/661, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/685, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K35/20, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/48, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/011, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/1709, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/18, A23V2250/54246, A23V2250/302 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/18, A23V2250/54252, A23V2250/302 (EP,US) (-) |
Former IPC [2007/31] | A23L1/30, A23L1/305, A61K38/01, A61K31/661 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROTEIN- UND FETT-FRAKTION ENTHALTENDE LEBENSMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR SCHNELLEN VERMINDERUNG VON ENTZÜNDLICHEN REAKTIONEN | [2007/31] | English: | FOOD COMPOSITION COMPRISING A PROTEIN- AND A LIPID FRACTION FOR RAPIDLY ATTENUATING INFLAMMATORY RESPONSES | [2007/31] | French: | COMPOSITION ALIMENTAIRE COMPRENANT UNE FRACTION PROTÉIQUE ET UNE FRACTION LIPIDIQUE POUR L'ATTÉNUATION RAPIDE D'UNE RÉACTION INFLAMMATOIRE | [2007/31] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/31] | 20.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/27] | 17.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.08.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.12.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 14.12.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.12.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.01.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 14.01.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.02.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO03009704 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [XD] 1-15 * page 1, line 31 - page 2, line 20; examples 3,6,9; claims 1,2,5,17-19,21,22 * * page 13, line 22 - page 14, line 7 *; | [X]US2004192615 (HAGEMAN ROBERT JOHAN JOSEPH [NL]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0042]; examples 3,10; claims 3,28 *; | [XD]WO2004068969 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [XD] 1-15 * page 13, line 15 - line 25; examples 3,6; claims 1,4,8-10,19 * * page 20, line 25 - page 21, line 17 *; | [X]JP2004099563 ; | [XD]US5434183 (LARSSON-BACKSTROEM CARIN [SE]) [XD] 15 * column 5, line 9 - line 11; examples 2,3; claims 7,8,19-22 * * column 6, line 9 - line 13 *; | [XD]DE19757414 (NUTRICIA NV [NL]) [XD] 15 * page 2, line 64 - page 3, line 10; claim 15; tables 1-5 * * page 9, line 43 - line 51 *; | [XD]EP1090636 (NESTLE SA [CH], et al) [XD] 15 * page 5, line 1 - line 25; claims 1,9,10 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2004099563 A 20040402 (MEIJI MILK PROD CO LTD) [X] 15 * abstract * |