EP1829228 - A HYBRID RECEIVER ARCHITECTURE USING UPCONVERSION FOLLOWED BY DIRECT DOWNCONVERSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maxlinear, Inc. 2051 Palomar Airport Road, Suite 100 Carlsbad, CA 92011-1462 / US | [2010/51] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states Maxlinear, Inc. 2036 Corte Del Nogal, 200 Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEENDRIPU, Kishore 7174 Pintail Drive Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | 02 /
MONTEMAYOR, Raymond 2340 Carol View Drive, suite 301 Cardiff by the Sea, CA 92007 / US | 03 /
YE, Sheng 3991-G Miramar Street La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 04 /
CHANG, Glenn 30312 Anamonte Laguna Niguel, Ca 92677 / US | 05 /
LING, Curtis 3162 North Mountain View San Diego, CA 92116 / US | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/36] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05809078.8 | 12.10.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005US36514 | Priority number, date | US20040618241P | 12.10.2004 Original published format: US 618241 P | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006044373 | Date: | 27.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1829228 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/28, H03D7/16 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
H04B1/28 (EP,US);
H03D7/166 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYBRIDE EMPFÄNGERARCHITEKTUR MIT AUFWÄRTSUMSETZUNG GEFOLGT DURCH DIREKTE ABWÄRTSUMSETZUNG | [2007/36] | English: | A HYBRID RECEIVER ARCHITECTURE USING UPCONVERSION FOLLOWED BY DIRECT DOWNCONVERSION | [2007/36] | French: | ARCHITECTURE DE RECEPTEUR HYBRIDE UTILISANT UNE CONVERSION ASCENDANTE SUIVIE D'UNE CONVERSION DESCENDANTE DIRECTE | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 27.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/42] | 04.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1182775 (ZARLINK SEMICONDUCTOR LTD [GB]) [X] 1-21 * paragraphs [0007] - [0010] - [0020] , [0021]; figure 1 *; | [X]GB2392566 (ZARLINK SEMICONDUCTOR LTD [GB]) [X] 1-21 * abstract *; | [X]EP0431397 (GEN INSTRUMENT CORP [US]) [X] 1-21 * abstract *; | [X]EP1300956 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]US5101499 (STRECK DONALD A [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract * | Examination | US2004137869 | EP0473373 |