EP1815061 - STRAND WITH INCREASED ADHERENCE TO METAL DISKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DE | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teufelberger Gesellschaft m.b.H. Vogelweiderstrasse 50 A-4600 Wels / AT | [2007/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIRTH, Rudolf Am Poschenhof 45 A-4840 Vöcklabruck / AT | 02 /
KRONLACHNER, Klaus Schmiedinger Strasse 4 A-4631 Krenglbach / AT | 03 /
SCHIEMER, Susanna Breitwiesergutstrasse 8 A-4020 Linz / AT | 04 /
SONNLEITNER, Georg Marcusstrasse 8 A-4611 Buchkirchen / AT | [2007/32] | Representative(s) | Nemec, Harald, et al Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/32] | Nemec, Harald, et al Kopecky & Schwarz Wipplingerstrasse 32/22 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 05809105.9 | 23.11.2005 | [2007/32] | WO2005AT00469 | Priority number, date | AT20040001991 | 25.11.2004 Original published format: AT 19912004 | [2007/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006055995 | Date: | 01.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1815061 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1815061 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | D07B1/02 | [2007/32] | CPC: |
D07B1/02 (EP,US);
D07B5/005 (EP,US);
D07B1/04 (EP,US);
D07B2201/2089 (EP,US);
D07B2201/209 (EP,US);
D07B2201/20903 (EP,US);
D07B2201/20907 (EP,US);
D07B2205/2014 (EP,US);
D07B2205/2032 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
D07B2205/2014, D07B2801/22 (EP,US);
D07B2205/2032, D07B2801/22 (US,EP);
D07B2205/205, D07B2801/22 (US,EP);
D07B2205/2096, D07B2801/22 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | CZ, DE, FI, GB [2008/04] |
Former [2007/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STRANG MIT ERHÖHTER HAFTUNG AUF METALLSCHEIBEN | [2009/12] | English: | STRAND WITH INCREASED ADHERENCE TO METAL DISKS | [2007/32] | French: | CORDE AVEC ADHERENCE ACCRUE SUR DES DISQUES METALLIQUES | [2009/12] |
Former [2007/32] | STRANG MIT ERH\HTER HAFTUNG AUF METALLSCHEIBEN | ||
Former [2007/32] | CORDE A ADHERENCE ACCRUE SUR DES DISQUES METALLIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 26.06.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.08.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, DK, EE, ES, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 14.10.2009 | DE | 01.06.2010 | [2011/02] |
Former [2010/24] | FI | 14.10.2009 | Cited in | International search | [DX]EP0150702 (TEUFELBERGER GMBH) [DX] 1,15,17,20 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0198567 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1,2,5,13,15,17,20 * figure 1; claims 1,3,5,9 *; | [A]US4016714 (CRANDALL JULIAN TITSWORTH, et al) [A] 1 * figure 6; claims 1,6,8 * |