EP1805341 - HOT-DIP COATING METHOD IN A ZINC BATH FOR STRIPS OF IRON/CARBON/MANGANESE STEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ArcelorMittal France 1- 5, rue Luigi Cherubini 93200 Saint Denis / FR | [2008/19] |
Former [2007/28] | For all designated states ARCELOR France 5 rue Luigi Cherubini 93212 La Plaine Saint Denis Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRILLET, Pascal 9, chemin de Banauvignes F-57160 Rozerieulles / FR | 02 /
BOULEAU, Daniel 15, rue André Theuriet F-57000 Metz / FR | [2007/28] | Representative(s) | Plaisant, Sophie Marie ARCELOR France Arcelor Research Intellectual Property 5 Rue Luigi Cherubini 93212 La Plaine Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Plaisant, Sophie Marie ARCELOR France Arcelor Research Intellectual Property 5 Rue Luigi Cherubini 93212 La Plaine Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/19] | Plaisant, Sophie Marie ArcelorMittal France Intellectual Property 1-5 Luigi Cherubini 93200 Saint-Denis / FR | ||
Former [2007/28] | Plaisant, Sophie Marie ARCELOR France Arcelor Research Intellectual Property 1-5, rue Luigi Cherubini 93200 Saint-Denis / FR | Application number, filing date | 05809221.4 | 10.10.2005 | [2007/28] | WO2005FR02491 | Priority number, date | FR20040011190 | 20.10.2004 Original published format: FR 0411190 | [2007/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006042930 | Date: | 27.04.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1805341 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1805341 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C23C2/02, C23C2/06 | [2007/28] | CPC: |
C23C2/06 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/0222 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/02 (EP,US);
C23C2/0224 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/40 (KR);
Y10S428/939 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12799 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/28] | Extension states | AL | 21.05.2007 | BA | 21.05.2007 | HR | 21.05.2007 | MK | 21.05.2007 | YU | 21.05.2007 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FEUERVERZINKTEN BESCHICHTUNG IN EINEM ZINKBAD FÜR STREIFEN AUS EISEN-KARBON-MANGAN-STAHL | [2007/28] | English: | HOT-DIP COATING METHOD IN A ZINC BATH FOR STRIPS OF IRON/CARBON/MANGANESE STEEL | [2007/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE REVÊTEMENT AU TREMPÉ À CHAUD DANS UN BAIN DE ZINC DES BANDES EN ACIER FER-CARBONE-MANGANÈSE | [2007/28] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/28] | 20.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.05.2008 | DK | 07.05.2008 | EE | 07.05.2008 | IE | 07.05.2008 | LT | 07.05.2008 | LV | 07.05.2008 | SI | 07.05.2008 | BG | 07.08.2008 | GR | 08.08.2008 | IS | 07.09.2008 | PT | 07.10.2008 | LU | 10.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | [2011/02] |
Former [2010/40] | CY | 07.05.2008 | |
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
LU | 10.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | DK | 07.05.2008 | |
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
LU | 10.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | DK | 07.05.2008 | |
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | DK | 07.05.2008 | |
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/17] | DK | 07.05.2008 | |
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | DK | 07.05.2008 | |
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 07.05.2008 | |
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | LV | 07.05.2008 | |
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/51] | LV | 07.05.2008 | |
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 07.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH07278772 ; | [A]US4512804 (KOS BERND [AT]) [A] 1,22* abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, & JP07278772 A 19951024 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1,22 * abstract * |