EP1815797 - ULTRASONOGRAPHIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2007/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWASHIMA, Tomonao, Olympus Medical Systems Corp 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo, 151-0072 / JP | 02 /
KOMURO Masahiko, Olympus Medical Systems Corp 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo, 151-0072 / JP | [2007/32] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/32] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05809481.4 | 24.11.2005 | [2007/32] | WO2005JP21576 | Priority number, date | JP20040341256 | 25.11.2004 Original published format: JP 2004341256 | [2007/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006057296 | Date: | 01.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1815797 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/00, A61B8/12, A61B8/13, A61B8/08 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
A61B8/0841 (EP,US);
A61B8/12 (EP,US);
A61B8/13 (EP,US);
A61B8/4444 (EP,US);
A61B8/463 (EP,US);
A61B8/466 (EP,US);
A61B8/483 (EP,US);
A61B2090/364 (EP,US);
A61B2090/378 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/32] | A61B8/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/10] |
Former [2007/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLGERÄT | [2007/32] | English: | ULTRASONOGRAPHIC DEVICE | [2007/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF ULTRASONOGRAPHIQUE | [2007/32] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2007 | Translation filed | 04.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2007 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 03.07.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO02064011 (MEDIGUIDE LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1,20 * page 29, line 30 - page 31, line 24 * * page 46, line 3 - line 9 * * page 59, line 11 - line 28 * * page 42, line 14 - line 24 * * figure 20 * [Y] 3-10,22; | [Y]WO2004098414 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 3-10,22 * see EP1623674 *; | EP1623674 [ ] (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP [JP]) [ ] * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018] ** figure 15 * | International search | [X]JP2003038492 (PENTAX CORP, et al); | [X]JP2004230194 (OLYMPUS CORP); | [A] - OHKUMA K ET AL, "Real-time virtual sonography.", J MED ULTRASONIC., (20030415), vol. 30, page S277, XP002990182 |