EP1816100 - NANO TWEEZERS AND SCANNING PROBE MICROSCOPE HAVING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National University Corporation Kagawa University 1-1 Saiwai-cho Takamatsu, Kagawa 760-8521 / JP | For all designated states Aoi Electronics Co. Ltd. 455-1, Kohzai Minamimachi Takamatsu-shi, Kagawa 761-8014 / JP | [2007/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASHIGUCHI, Gen, F. OF ENG. NUC KAGAWA UNIVERSITY 2217-20, Hayashi-cho Takamatsu-shi, Kagawa / JP | 02 /
HOSOGI, Maho, F. OF ENG. NUC KAGAWA UNIVERSITY 2217-20, Hayashi-cho Takamatsu-shi, Kagawa / JP | 03 /
KONNO, Takashi, AOI ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 455-1, Kohzai-Minamimachi Takamatsu-shi, Kagawa 761-8014 / JP | [2007/32] | Representative(s) | Schaeberle, Steffen Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/32] | Schaeberle, Steffen Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05809524.1 | 22.11.2005 | [2007/32] | WO2005JP21456 | Priority number, date | JP20040337842 | 22.11.2004 Original published format: JP 2004337842 | JP20050042883 | 18.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005042883 | [2007/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006054771 | Date: | 26.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1816100 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B82B1/00, B82B3/00, B81B3/00, G01B21/30, G01N13/16 | [2007/32] | CPC: |
B81C99/002 (EP,US);
B82Y35/00 (US);
G01Q60/38 (EP,US);
G01Q80/00 (EP,US);
Y10S977/902 (EP,US);
Y10S977/962 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI [2008/01] |
Former [2007/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NANOPINZETTE UND RASTERMIKROSKOP DAMIT | [2007/32] | English: | NANO TWEEZERS AND SCANNING PROBE MICROSCOPE HAVING THE SAME | [2007/32] | French: | NANOPINCES ET MICROSCOPE-SONDE DE BALAYAGE EQUIPE DE TELLES PINCES | [2007/32] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2006 | Translation filed | 31.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2007 | Search fee paid | 31.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 23.06.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.08.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.10.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.08.2007 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | BG   M02   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | CY   M02   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | CZ   M02   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | DK   M02   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | EE   M02   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | ES   M02   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | FI   M02   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | GR   M02   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | HU   M02   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | IE   M02   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | IS   M02   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | LT   M02   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | LV   M02   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | MC   M02   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | PL   M02   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | PT   M02   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | RO   M02   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | SI   M02   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | SK   M02   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | TR   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03045838 (TECHNO NETWORK SHIKOKU CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2001252900 (NAKAYAMA YOSHIKAZU, et al); | [A]JP2004028830 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP); | [A]JP2004317255 (SII NANOTECHNOLOGY INC); | [A]JPH0890431 (SHIMADZU CORP); | [A]US2002061662 (BOGGILD PETER [DK]); | [A]US2002122766 (LIEBER CHARLES M [US], et al); | [A]JPS584389U ; | [A]JPH1144697 (SEIKO INSTR INC) | [A] - HASHIGUCHI G. ET AL, "Micromachining Gijutsu ni yoru Netsu Bocho Actuator Ittaigata Nanogripper no Kaihatsu", THE TRANSACTIONS OF THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS OF JAPAN E, (2003), vol. 123-E, pages 1 - 8, XP003007775 |