EP1824545 - ENDOBRONCHIAL BLOCKING DEVICE HAVING A REPLACEABLE SNARE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cook Medical Technologies LLC 750 North Daniels Way Bloomington, IN 47404 / US | [2012/04] |
Former [2011/43] | For all designated states Cook Medical Technologies LLC P.O. Box 2269 Bloomington, IN 47402 / US | ||
Former [2007/35] | For all designated states Cook Critical Care Incorporated 750 North Daniels Way Bloomington, IN 47404 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KURRUS, Michael, R. 6619 Farmleigh Drive Indianapolis, IN 46220 / US | [2007/35] | Representative(s) | Garratt, Peter Douglas, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2015/47] |
Former [2007/35] | Garratt, Peter Douglas, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05809985.4 | 11.10.2005 | [2007/35] | WO2005US37005 | Priority number, date | US20040619487P | 15.10.2004 Original published format: US 619487 P | [2007/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006044651 | Date: | 27.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1824545 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1824545 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/04, A61M25/10, A61M25/01, A61B17/12 | [2007/35] | CPC: |
A61M16/0488 (EP,US);
A61B17/12104 (EP,US);
A61B17/12136 (EP,US);
A61M16/04 (EP,US);
A61M16/0404 (EP,US);
A61M16/0445 (EP);
A61M16/0459 (EP,US);
A61M16/0475 (EP);
A61M16/0486 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/47] |
Former [2007/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ENDOBRONCHIALE BLOCKIERVORRICHTUNG MIT AUSTAUSCHBARER SCHLINGE | [2007/35] | English: | ENDOBRONCHIAL BLOCKING DEVICE HAVING A REPLACEABLE SNARE | [2007/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BLOCAGE ENDOBRONCHIQUE A ANSE REMPLAÇABLE | [2007/35] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 07.09.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 11.10.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 03.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.10.2005 | AT | 18.11.2015 | BE | 18.11.2015 | BG | 18.11.2015 | CY | 18.11.2015 | CZ | 18.11.2015 | DK | 18.11.2015 | EE | 18.11.2015 | ES | 18.11.2015 | FI | 18.11.2015 | IT | 18.11.2015 | LT | 18.11.2015 | LV | 18.11.2015 | MC | 18.11.2015 | NL | 18.11.2015 | PL | 18.11.2015 | RO | 18.11.2015 | SE | 18.11.2015 | SI | 18.11.2015 | SK | 18.11.2015 | TR | 18.11.2015 | GR | 19.02.2016 | IS | 18.03.2016 | PT | 18.03.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 11.10.2005 | |
AT | 18.11.2015 | ||
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
TR | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 11.10.2005 | |
AT | 18.11.2015 | ||
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
LT | 18.11.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9952441 (DUBINSKY THEODORE J [US]) [X] 1-16 * page 11, line 19 - page 13, line 29 * * page 18, line 9 - page 19, line 28 * * figures 1A,4A,4B *; | [DA]US5904648 (ARNDT GEORGE A [US], et al) [DA] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US4824435 (GIESY JERRY D [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * column 4, lines 11-28 * * figures 8,9 *; | [A]US5964223 (BARAN GEORGE [CA]) [A] 1,10 * column 13, lines 36-44 * * figure 9 * | by applicant | US5904648 |