EP1803265 - FORWARDING TABLE REDUCTION AND MULTIPATH NETWORK FORWARDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2017/27] |
Former [2007/27] | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Road San Jose, CA 95134 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KREEGER, Lawrence 41241 Chiltern Drive Fremont, CA 94539 / US | 02 /
EDSALL, Thomas 13208 Peacock Court Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 03 /
GANESAN, Elango 1807 Hamilton Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 04 /
GAI, Silvano 20919 Woodside Way Groveland, CA 95321 / US | [2007/34] |
Former [2007/27] | 01 /
KREEGER, Lawrence 41241 Chiltern Drive Fremont, CA 94539 / US | ||
02 /
EDSALL, Thomas 13208 Peacock Court Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
03 /
GANESAN, Elango 1807 Hamilton Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | |||
04 /
GAI, Silvano 3021 Mauna Loa Court San Jose, CA 95132 / US | Representative(s) | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/27] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | ||
Former [2007/27] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05810293.0 | 18.10.2005 | [2007/27] | WO2005US37765 | Priority number, date | US20040621396P | 22.10.2004 Original published format: US 621396 P | US20050152991 | 14.06.2005 Original published format: US 152991 | [2007/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006047223 | Date: | 04.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1803265 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1803265 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.12.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/753, H04L12/773, H04L12/721, H04L12/931, H04L12/935, H04L12/947 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
H04L45/66 (EP,US);
H04L45/48 (EP,US);
H04L45/54 (EP,US);
H04L45/60 (EP,US);
H04L45/74 (EP,US);
H04L49/351 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/27] | H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/27] |
Former [2007/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | REDUZIERUNG VON WEITERLEITUNGSTABELLEN UND MULTIPFAD-NETZWERKWEITERLEITUNG | [2007/27] | English: | FORWARDING TABLE REDUCTION AND MULTIPATH NETWORK FORWARDING | [2007/27] | French: | RÉDUCTION DES TABLES DE RÉACHEMINEMENT ET RÉACHEMINEMENT À TRAJETS MULTIPLES DANS UN RÉSEAU | [2017/09] |
Former [2007/27] | REDUCTION DES TABLES DE REACHEMINEMENT ET REACHEMINEMENT A TRAJETS MULTIPLES DANS UN RESEAU | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 19.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/27] | 07.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17179671.7 / EP3249866 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.10.2005 | AT | 05.07.2017 | CY | 05.07.2017 | CZ | 05.07.2017 | DK | 05.07.2017 | EE | 05.07.2017 | ES | 05.07.2017 | FI | 05.07.2017 | IT | 05.07.2017 | LT | 05.07.2017 | LV | 05.07.2017 | MC | 05.07.2017 | NL | 05.07.2017 | PL | 05.07.2017 | PT | 05.07.2017 | RO | 05.07.2017 | SE | 05.07.2017 | SI | 05.07.2017 | SK | 05.07.2017 | TR | 05.07.2017 | BG | 05.10.2017 | GR | 06.10.2017 | IE | 18.10.2017 | LU | 18.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | CH | 31.10.2017 | LI | 31.10.2017 | IS | 05.11.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 18.10.2005 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CY | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
TR | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IE | 18.10.2017 | ||
LU | 18.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 18.10.2005 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CY | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IE | 18.10.2017 | ||
LU | 18.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 18.10.2005 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IE | 18.10.2017 | ||
LU | 18.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IE | 18.10.2017 | ||
LU | 18.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
LU | 18.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
LU | 18.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
LU | 18.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/26] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 05.07.2017 | |
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 05.07.2017 | |
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 05.07.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6556541 (BARE BALLARD C [US]) [X] 1,3-8,11,15,16[I] 2,9,10,12-14,17,18 | International search | [X]US5920566 (HENDEL ARIEL [US], et al); | [X]US5974467 (HADDOCK STEPHEN R [US], et al); | [X]US6556541 (BARE BALLARD C [US]); | [X]US2004032856 (SANDSTROM MARK HENRIK [US]); | [XP]US2005190752 (CHIOU CHENG-MAU [TW], et al) | by applicant | US6556541 |