EP1805199 - METHODS FOR NUCLEIC ACID AMPLIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/28] | PRIMERS, PROBES AND METHODS FOR NUCLEIC ACID AMPLIFICATION | ||
[2010/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRANDEIS UNIVERSITY 415 South Street Waltham, MA 02454-9110 / US | [2007/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANGH, Lawrence, J. 20 Duffield Road Auburndale, MA 02466 / US | 02 /
RICE, John 268 Common Street Quincy, MA 02169 / US | 03 /
SANCHEZ, Aquiles, J. 14 Foster Drive Framingham, MA 01701 / US | 04 /
PIERCE, Kenneth 52 Walnut Street Natick, MA 01760 / US | 05 /
SALK, Jesse 3011 Webster Point Road N.E. Seattle, WA 98105 / US | 06 /
REIS, Arthur 28 Williams Street,Arlington Street Arlington, MA 02476-5624 / US | 07 /
HARTSHORN, Cristina 1560 Great Plain Avenue Needham, MA 02492 / US | [2007/42] |
Former [2007/28] | 01 /
WANGH, Lawrence, J. 20 Duffield Road Auburndale, MA 02466 / US | ||
02 /
RICE, John 268 Common Street Quincy, MA 02169 / US | |||
03 /
SANCHEZ, Aquiles, J. 14 Foster Drive Framingham, MA 01701 / US | |||
04 /
PIERCE, Kenneth 52 Walnut Street Natick, MA 01760 / US | |||
05 /
SALK, Jesse 3011 Webster Point Road N.E. Seattle, WA 98105 / US | |||
06 /
REIS, Arthur 28 Williams Street,Arlington Street Arlington, MA 02476-5624 / US | Representative(s) | Pitman, Richard Stephen, et al Avidity IP Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/28] | Pitman, Richard Stephen, et al HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05810422.5 | 17.10.2005 | [2007/28] | WO2005US37667 | Priority number, date | US20040619654P | 18.10.2004 Original published format: US 619654 P | [2007/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006044994 | Date: | 27.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1805199 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1805199 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07H21/04, C12P19/34, C12Q1/68 | [2007/28] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6844 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q1/6876 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q1/6869 (US);
C12N15/11 (KR);
C12Q1/6851 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/16 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6844, C12Q2545/114, C12Q2531/107, C12Q2527/107 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6851, C12Q2561/113, C12Q2531/107, C12Q2527/107 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/28] | Extension states | AL | 20.04.2007 | BA | 20.04.2007 | HR | 20.04.2007 | MK | 20.04.2007 | YU | 20.04.2007 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR NUKLEINSÄUREAMPLIFIKATION | [2010/28] | English: | METHODS FOR NUCLEIC ACID AMPLIFICATION | [2010/28] | French: | PROCEDES D'AMPLIFICATION D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES | [2010/28] |
Former [2007/28] | PRIMER, SONDEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR NUKLEINSÄUREAMPLIFIKATION | ||
Former [2007/28] | PRIMERS, PROBES AND METHODS FOR NUCLEIC ACID AMPLIFICATION | ||
Former [2007/28] | AMORCES, SONDES ET PROCEDES D'AMPLIFICATION D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/28] | 25.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10187807.2 / EP2351766 | EP14195859.5 / EP2927238 | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.01.2011 | CZ | 05.01.2011 | EE | 05.01.2011 | FI | 05.01.2011 | HU | 05.01.2011 | LT | 05.01.2011 | LV | 05.01.2011 | RO | 05.01.2011 | SI | 05.01.2011 | SK | 05.01.2011 | TR | 05.01.2011 | BG | 05.04.2011 | GR | 06.04.2011 | IS | 05.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 05.01.2011 | |
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
TR | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 05.01.2011 | |
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | CY | 05.01.2011 | |
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 05.01.2011 | |
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 05.01.2011 | |
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | SI | 05.01.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6174670 (WITTWER CARL T [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO02097132 (SECR DEFENCE [GB], et al) [Y] 1-8 * pages 9-10 *; | [A]WO03040397 (GORILLA GENOMICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [Y]EP1375674 (TOSOH CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [Y] - SANCHEZ J AQUILES ET AL, "Linear-After-The-Exponential (LATE)-PCR: An advanced method of asymmetric PCR and its uses in quantitative real-time analysis", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, (20040217), vol. 101, no. 7, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 1933 - 1938, XP002397153 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0305476101 | [Y] - WITTWER C T ET AL, "CONTINUOUS FLUORESCENCE MONITORING OF RAPID CYCLE DNA AMPLIFICATION", BIOTECHNIQUES, INFORMA LIFE SCIENCES PUBLISHING, WESTBOROUGH, MA, US, (19970101), vol. 22, no. 1, ISSN 0736-6205, pages 130/131,134 - 138, XP000683698 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document * | [Y] - CANE P A ET AL, "USE OF REAL-TIME PCR AND FLUORIMETRY TO DETECT LAMIVUDINE RESISTANCE-ASSOCIATED MUTATIONS IN HEPATITIS B VIRUS", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19990701), vol. 43, no. 7, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 1600 - 1608, XP001156948 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]WO0131062 (NEW YORK HEALTH RES INST [US], et al); | [X]US2004053254 (WANGH LAWRENCE J [US], et al); | [X] - SANCHEZ ET AL., "Linear-after-the-exponential (LATE)-PCR: An advanced method of asymmetric PCR and its uses in quantitative real-time analysis", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES USA, (200402), vol. 101, no. 7, pages 1933 - 1938, XP002397153 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0305476101 | [X] - PIERCE ET AL., "Detection of cystic fibrosis alleles from single cells using molecular beacons and a novel method of asymmetric real-time PCR", MOLECULAR HUMAN REPRODUCTION, (200312), vol. 9, no. 12, pages 815 - 820, XP002397152 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/molehr/gag100 | [Y] - NORDSTROM ET AL., "Method enabling pyrosequencing on double-stranded DNA", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (200007), vol. 282, no. 2, pages 186 - 193, XP008096692 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abio.2000.4603 |