EP1827438 - PIPERAZIN DERIVATIVES FOR INHIBITING HUMAN STEAROYL-COA-DESATURASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/36] | PYRIDINE DERIVATIVES FOR INHIBITING HUMAN STEAROYL-COA-DESATURASE | ||
[2014/34] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 07.11.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): LV | published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xenon Pharmaceuticals Inc. 3650 Gilmore Way Burnaby, BC V5G 4W8 / CA | [2011/02] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states XENON PHARMACEUTICALS INC. 3650 Gilmore Way Burnaby, British Columbia V5G 4W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMBOJ, Rajender 5809 Sperling Avenue Burnaby, British Columbia V5E 2T6 / CA | 02 /
KODUMURU, Vishnumurthy 211-6577 Royal Oak Avenue Burnaby, British Columbia V5H 3P3 / CA | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/50] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/36] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05810510.7 | 20.09.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005US34136 | Priority number, date | US20040611647P | 20.09.2004 Original published format: US 611647 P | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006034446 | Date: | 30.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1827438 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1827438 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1827438 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/496 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
C07D213/81 (EP,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Title | German: | PIPERAZINE DERIVATE ZUR HEMMUNG DER MENSCHLICHEN STEAROYL-COA-DESATURASE | [2014/34] | English: | PIPERAZIN DERIVATIVES FOR INHIBITING HUMAN STEAROYL-COA-DESATURASE | [2014/34] | French: | DERIVES DE LA PIPERAZINE ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME AGENTS THERAPEUTIQUES | [2014/34] |
Former [2007/36] | PYRIDIN-DERIVATE ZUR HEMMUNG DER MENSCHLICHEN STEAROYL-COA-DESATURASE | ||
Former [2007/36] | PYRIDINE DERIVATIVES FOR INHIBITING HUMAN STEAROYL-COA-DESATURASE | ||
Former [2007/36] | DERIVES HETEROCYCLIQUES ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME AGENTS THERAPEUTIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 17.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2010 | Observations by third parties | Divisional application(s) | EP10012999.8 / EP2316457 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.07.2011
19.07.2011
ADMISSIBLE STRAWMAN LIMITED 34 Lovedon Lane Winchester Hampshire, SO23 7NU / GB Opponent's representative Wroe, Stephanie, et al, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | 02
06.10.2011
18.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE Opponent's representative Uexküll & Stolberg, et al, et al Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | 03
12.10.2011
18.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Thwaite, Jonathan Simon, et al, et al Syngenta Crop Protection Münchwilen AG Intellectual Property Schaffhauserstrasse 4332 Stein / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.07.2011
19.07.2011
ADMISSIBLE STRAWMAN LIMITED 34 Lovedon Lane Winchester Hampshire, SO23 7NU / GB Opponent's representative Wroe, Stephanie, et al, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
02
06.10.2011
18.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE Opponent's representative UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG, et al, et al Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | |||
03
12.10.2011
18.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Thwaite, Jonathan Simon, et al, et al Syngenta Crop Protection Münchwilen AG, Intellectual Property Schaffhauser Strasse 4332 Stein / CH | |||
Former [2011/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.07.2011
19.07.2011
ADMISSIBLE STRAWMAN LIMITED 34 Lovedon Lane Winchester Hampshire, SO23 7NU / GB Opponent's representative Wroe, Stephanie, et al, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
02
06.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE Opponent's representative UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2011/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.07.2011
ADMISSIBLE STRAWMAN LIMITED 34 Lovedon Lane Winchester Hampshire, SO23 7NU / GB Opponent's representative Wroe, Stephanie, et al, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | 17.11.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.09.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.01.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.02.2014 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.02.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.07.2014 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 29.09.2014 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 09.05.2014 | Appeal received No. T1068/14 | 04.07.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.01.2011 | BE | 12.01.2011 | CY | 12.01.2011 | CZ | 12.01.2011 | DK | 12.01.2011 | EE | 12.01.2011 | FI | 12.01.2011 | HU | 12.01.2011 | LT | 12.01.2011 | LV | 12.01.2011 | NL | 12.01.2011 | PL | 12.01.2011 | RO | 12.01.2011 | SE | 12.01.2011 | SI | 12.01.2011 | SK | 12.01.2011 | TR | 12.01.2011 | BG | 12.04.2011 | GR | 13.04.2011 | IS | 12.05.2011 | PT | 12.05.2011 | IE | 20.09.2011 | LU | 20.09.2011 | CH | 30.09.2011 | LI | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | [2015/29] |
Former [2015/24] | AT | 12.01.2011 | |
BE | 12.01.2011 | ||
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
DK | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
HU | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
NL | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
RO | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
TR | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
IE | 20.09.2011 | ||
LU | 20.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/45] | AT | 12.01.2011 | |
BE | 12.01.2011 | ||
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
DK | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
HU | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
NL | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
RO | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
TR | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
IE | 20.09.2011 | ||
LU | 20.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 12.01.2011 | |
BE | 12.01.2011 | ||
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
DK | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
NL | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
RO | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
TR | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
IE | 20.09.2011 | ||
LU | 20.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 12.01.2011 | |
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 12.01.2011 | |
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO2005011654 (XENON PHARMACEUTICALS INC [CA], et al) [PX] 1-18 * the whole document * * examples 1-4 * * claims 1-71 *; | [PX]WO2005011655 (XENON PHARMACEUTICALS INC [CA], et al) [PX] 1-18 * the whole document * * examples 1-32 * * claims 1-91 *; | [PX]WO2005011656 (XENON PHARMACEUTICALS INC [CA], et al) [PX] 1-18 * the whole document * * examples 1-5 * * claims 1-51 *; | [PX]WO2005011657 (XENON PHARMACEUTICALS INC [CA], et al) [PX] 1-18 * the whole document * * examples 1-4 * * claims 1-51 *; | [A] - COHEN, P; NTAMBI, J M; FRIEDMAN, J M, "Stearoyl-CoA desaturase-1 and the metabolic syndrome", CURENT DRUG TARGETS: IMMUNE, ENDOCRINE AND METABOLIC DISORDERS, (2003), vol. 3, no. 4, pages 271 - 280, XP009063538 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/1568013023358843 | Opposition | WO03043636 | WO03105853 | WO2004011430 |