EP1718919 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING AND RETRIEVING POSITIONAL INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hodge, Bruce 54 Wilton Road Greenfield, NY 12833 / US | [2006/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/45] | Representative(s) | Treeby, Philip David William, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Treeby, Philip David William, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/45] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05810518.0 | 09.02.2005 | [2006/45] | WO2005US03921 | Priority number, date | US20040543342P | 10.02.2004 Original published format: US 543342 P | US20040636479P | 16.12.2004 Original published format: US 636479 P | [2006/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006028490 | Date: | 16.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1718919 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.02.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F41J5/04 | [2006/45] | CPC: |
F41J2/02 (EP,US);
F41J5/041 (EP,US);
G01M7/08 (EP,US);
B63B43/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG UND ERFASSUNG VON POSITIONSINFORMATIONEN | [2006/45] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING AND RETRIEVING POSITIONAL INFORMATION | [2006/45] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER ET DE RECUPERER DES DONNEES DE POSITION | [2006/45] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 11.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/45] | 06.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/02] | 14.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5516113 (HODGE ROBERT B [US]) [A] 1,20 * abstract * * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 31 ** figures 1-2 * | International search | [A]US3727069 (CRITTENDEN E, et al); | [A]US5516113 (HODGE ROBERT B [US]) | by applicant | US5514113 | US5516113 |