EP1815492 - MICROWAVE GENERATING DEVICE WITH OSCILLATING VIRTUAL CATHODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: FR | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 25, rue Leblanc Immeuble "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | [2007/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAURE, Jean-Louis 59 bis rue du Fonds de Calais F-91360 VILLEMOISSON SUR ORGE / FR | 02 /
GOUARD, Philippe 10 bis rue du Bois Bouron F-91330 YERRES / FR | [2007/32] | Representative(s) | Poulin, Gérard BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | Poulin, Gérard Brevatome 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/32] | Poulin, Gérard Société BREVATOME 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 05810745.9 | 03.10.2005 | [2007/32] | WO2005FR50802 | Priority number, date | FR20040052264 | 05.10.2004 Original published format: FR 0452264 | [2007/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006037918 | Date: | 13.04.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1815492 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1815492 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01J25/02 | [2007/32] | CPC: |
H01J25/02 (EP);
H01J23/02 (EP);
H01J25/74 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROWELLENGENERATOR MIT OSZILLIERENDER VIRTUELLER KATHODE | [2007/32] | English: | MICROWAVE GENERATING DEVICE WITH OSCILLATING VIRTUAL CATHODE | [2007/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF GENERATEUR D'ONDES HYPERFREQUENCES A CATHODE VIRTUELLE OSCILLANTE | [2007/32] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 27.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.09.2009 | CY | 02.09.2009 | CZ | 02.09.2009 | DK | 02.09.2009 | EE | 02.09.2009 | FI | 02.09.2009 | IE | 02.09.2009 | IT | 02.09.2009 | LT | 02.09.2009 | LV | 02.09.2009 | NL | 02.09.2009 | PL | 02.09.2009 | RO | 02.09.2009 | SI | 02.09.2009 | SK | 02.09.2009 | TR | 02.09.2009 | LU | 03.10.2009 | BE | 31.10.2009 | BG | 31.10.2009 | CH | 31.10.2009 | LI | 31.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | GR | 03.12.2009 | ES | 13.12.2009 | IS | 02.01.2010 | PT | 04.01.2010 | HU | 03.03.2010 | [2018/31] |
Former [2011/44] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
IT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
TR | 02.09.2009 | ||
LU | 03.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 31.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
HU | 03.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
IT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
LU | 03.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 31.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
HU | 03.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
IT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
LU | 03.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 31.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
IT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 31.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/02] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/40] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/24] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/21] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | FI | 02.09.2009 | |
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4553068 (BRANDT HOWARD E [US]) [Y] 6 * column 3, lines 22-24; figure 2 *; | [A]US5113154 (CONVERT GUY [FR], et al) [A] 1-9* column W *; | [XY] - XUPENG CHEN ET AL INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "Cavity resonance effect on a coaxial vircator", 14TH. INTERNATIONAL PULSED POWER CONFERENCE. PPC-2003. DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS. DALLAS, TX, JUNE 15 - 18, 2003, IEEE PULSED POWER CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20030615), VOL. 2 OF 2. CONF. 14, ISBN 0-7803-7915-2, pages 1165 - 1168, XP010690864 [X] 1,2,4 * figure 1 * * page 1165, column R * * page 1167 - page 1168 * * - " - * [Y] 6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PPC.2003.1278019 | [X] - MANKOWSKI J ET AL INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "Efficiency results from a coaxial vircator using a simple feedback technique", 14TH. INTERNATIONAL PULSED POWER CONFERENCE. PPC-2003. DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS. DALLAS, TX, JUNE 15 - 18, 2003, IEEE PULSED POWER CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20030615), VOL. 2 OF 2. CONF. 14, ISBN 0-7803-7915-2, pages 455 - 458, XP010690504 [X] 1,2,4 * figure 2 * * pages 455-456 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PPC.2003.1277749 | [A] - EUN-HA CHOI ET AL, "High-Power Microwave Generation from an Axially Extracted Virtual Cathode Oscillator", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PLASMA SCIENCE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (200012), vol. 28, no. 6, ISSN 0093-3813, XP011045674 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | [A] - MITSUYASU YATSUZUKA ET AL, "Plasma Effects on Electron Beam Focusing and Microwave Emission in a Virtual Cathode Oscillator", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PLASMA SCIENCE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (199808), vol. 26, no. 4, ISSN 0093-3813, XP011045117 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * |