EP1805593 - TAILORING IMAGE DATA PACKETS TO PROPERTIES OF PRINT HEADS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujifilm Dimatix, Inc. 109 Etna Road Lebanon, NH 03766 / US | [2007/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIN, Robert 1461 Lewiston Drive Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | [2007/28] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/28] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05810801.0 | 11.10.2005 | [2007/28] | WO2005US36807 | Priority number, date | US20040977298 | 29.10.2004 Original published format: US 977298 | [2007/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006049836 | Date: | 11.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1805593 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12 | [2007/28] | CPC: |
G06F3/1204 (EP,US);
G06F3/12 (KR);
G06F3/1247 (EP,US);
G06F3/1284 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANPASSEN VON BILDDATENPAKETEN AN DIE EIGENSCHAFTEN VON DRUCKKÖPFEN | [2007/28] | English: | TAILORING IMAGE DATA PACKETS TO PROPERTIES OF PRINT HEADS | [2007/28] | French: | ADAPTATION SPECIFIQUE DE PAQUETS DE DONNEES D'IMAGES AUX PROPRIETES DES TETES D'IMPRESSION | [2007/28] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/28] | 10.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/36] | 21.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.08.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1293341 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG [JP]) [X] 1-27 * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0079] * * figure 7 *; | [X]EP1452313 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [X] 1-27 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0056] * * figures 12,13 *; | [A]EP1212201 (MIKOH IMAGING SYSTEMS PTY LTD [AU]) [A] 1-27 * page 2, line 7 - line 19 * * page 10, line 15 - page 11, line 18 * | Examination | JP2004094586 |