EP1799822 - AMIDASES FROM ASPERGILLUS NIGER AND THEIR USE IN A FOOD PRODUCTION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.02.2012 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [2009/38] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STREEKSTRA, Hugo Weteringstraat 28 (I) NL-1017 SP Amsterdam / NL | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Monaco, Vania, et al DSM Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/11] | Monaco, Vania, et al DSM Intellectual Property P.O. Box 130 6100 AC Echt / NL | ||
Former [2009/50] | Monaco, Vania, et al DSM Intellectual Property Delft Office 600-0240 P.O. Box 1 2600 MA Delft / NL | ||
Former [2007/26] | Donners, Ruth Emelia Wilhelmina, et al DSM Intellectual Property Delft Office (600-0240) P.O. Box 1 2600 MA Delft / NL | Application number, filing date | 05810939.8 | 13.10.2005 | [2007/26] | WO2005EP55242 | Priority number, date | EP20040105077 | 15.10.2004 Original published format: EP 04105077 | EP20040107053 | 29.12.2004 Original published format: EP 04107053 | EP20050106200 | 07.07.2005 Original published format: EP 05106200 | [2007/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006040345 | Date: | 20.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1799822 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/80, A23L1/015 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
A23L3/3463 (EP,US);
A23F5/163 (EP,US);
A23F5/243 (EP,US);
A23L5/25 (EP,US);
C12N9/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AMIDASEN AUS SCHWARZSCHIMMEL UND IHRE VERWENDUNG BEI DER LEBENSMITTELHERSTELLUNG | [2007/26] | English: | AMIDASES FROM ASPERGILLUS NIGER AND THEIR USE IN A FOOD PRODUCTION PROCESS | [2007/26] | French: | AMIDASES D'ASPERGILLUS NIGER ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS UN PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'ALIMENTS | [2007/26] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 16.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/10] | 22.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/10] | 06.10.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.01.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO2004037007 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [DA] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003219518 (LI ZHAOAYING [US]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0272025 (ICI PLC [GB]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004026043 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-6 * page 8 - page 9 * * examples 1,2 *; | [DA]WO9846772 (GIST BROCADES BV [NL], et al); | [DA]WO9932617 (DSM NV [NL], et al) | [X] - FRIEDMAN M, "Chemistry, biochemistry, and safety of acrylamide. A review", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (20030703), vol. 51, no. 16, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 4504 - 4526, XP002276620 [X] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf030204+ | [X] - "Aspergillus niger peptide-N4-(N-acetyl-beta-D-glucosaminyl) asparaginase amidase N (pngN) mRNA, complete cds.", EMBL, (19980107), Database accession no. U96923, URL: EBI, XP002330161 [X] 7-20 * the whole document * | [X] - "Aspergillus niger general amidase-B (gmdB) gene, complete cds.", EMBL, (20010410), Database accession no. AF349512, URL: EBI, XP002330162 [X] 7-20 * the whole document * |