EP1817566 - A DISPOSABLE HOMOGENIZER DEVICE AND ITS USE FOR THE PREPARATION OF HOMOGENIZED SAMPLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roggero, Gianmarco Via Sicilia 28 10043 Orbassano / IT | [2007/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/33] | Representative(s) | Rambelli, Paolo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Rambelli, Paolo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2007/33] | Rambelli, Paolo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia, 8 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 05810950.5 | 26.10.2005 | [2007/33] | WO2005EP55565 | Priority number, date | IT2004TO00743 | 27.10.2004 Original published format: IT TO20040743 | [2007/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006045816 | Date: | 04.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1817566 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/28, C12M3/08 | [2007/33] | CPC: |
G01N1/286 (EP,US);
G01N2001/2866 (EP,US);
G01N33/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINWEG-HOMOGENISATORVORRICHTUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG HOMOGENISIERTER PROBEN | [2007/33] | English: | A DISPOSABLE HOMOGENIZER DEVICE AND ITS USE FOR THE PREPARATION OF HOMOGENIZED SAMPLES | [2007/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF HOMOGENEISATEUR JETABLE ET SON UTILISATION POUR LA PREPARATION D'ECHANTILLONS HOMOGENEISES | [2007/33] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/33] | 04.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/43] | 05.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.04.2008 | 31.10.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5829696 (DESTEFANO MICHELLE S [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * column 2, line 29 - column 7, line 28 *; | [A]WO0248679 (ROGGERO GIANMARCO [IT]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * page 2, line 21 - page 4, line 10 *; | [A]US5533683 (FAY JOHN E [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 26 *; | [AP]WO2005047866 (ENFER TECHNOLOGY [IE], et al) [AP] 1-18 * abstract * * page 13, line 5 - page 16, line 29 * * page 19, line 16 - page 20, line 3 * |