EP1818706 - LIGHT PICKUP LENS, LIGHT EMITTING ELEMENT ASSEMBLY, SURFACE LIGHT SOURCE DEVICE, AND COLOR LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY UNIT ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/33] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NADA, Naoji, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 1410001 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIDA, Tetsuyuki, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 1410001 / JP | 03 /
UEDA, Mitsunori, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 1410001 / JP | 04 /
TOMIOKA, Satoshi, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 1410001 / JP | 05 /
OSAKO, Junichi, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 1410001 / JP | 06 /
KUBOTA, Shigeo, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 1410001 / JP | [2007/33] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frithjof E. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | [2008/41] |
Former [2007/33] | Müller, Frithjof E. Müller Hoffmann Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 D-81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05811782.1 | 02.12.2005 | [2007/33] | WO2005JP22215 | Priority number, date | JP20040352027 | 03.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004352027 | JP20050133677 | 28.04.2005 Original published format: JP 2005133677 | JP20050260908 | 08.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005260908 | [2007/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006059728 | Date: | 08.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1818706 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G02B13/00, G02B3/02, G02B13/18, G02F1/13357, H01L33/00 | [2007/33] | CPC: |
G02B17/0856 (EP,US);
G02F1/1335 (KR);
G02B3/00 (KR);
G02B5/02 (KR);
G02B5/265 (EP,US);
G02F1/133603 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/13091, H01L2924/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/02] |
Former [2007/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LICHTAUFNAHMELINSE, GRUPPE LICHTEMITTIERENDER ELEMENTE, OBERFLÄCHENLICHTQUELLENEINRICHTUNG UND FARB-FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGEEINHEIT-BAUGRUPPE | [2007/33] | English: | LIGHT PICKUP LENS, LIGHT EMITTING ELEMENT ASSEMBLY, SURFACE LIGHT SOURCE DEVICE, AND COLOR LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY UNIT ASSEMBLY | [2007/33] | French: | LENTILLE DE DÉTECTION DE LUMIÈRE, ENSEMBLE D'ÉLÉMENTS LUMINESCENTS, DISPOSITIF DE SOURCE LUMINEUSE SUPERFICIELLE, ET ENSEMBLE D'UNITÉS D'AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES DE COULEUR | [2007/33] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2007 | Translation filed | 01.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/33] | 04.07.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.08.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.02.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2003332630 (TOYODA GOSEI KK); | [Y]JP2004319458 (FUJITSU DISPLAY TECH) |