EP1800312 - DYNAMIC MONITORING OF CELL ADHESION AND SPREADING USING THE RT-CES SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acea Biosciences, Inc. 11585 Sorrento Valley Road, Suite 103 San Diego CA 92121 / US | [2007/47] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states Abassi, Yama A. Acea Biosciences 11585 Sorrento Valley Rd. Suite 103 San Diego CA 92121 / US | ||
For all designated states Atienza, Josephine Acea Biosciences 11585 Sorrento Valley Rd Suite 103 San Diego CA 92121 / US | |||
For all designated states Xu, Xiao Acea Biosciences 11585 Sorrento Valley Road, Suite 103 San Diego, Ca 92121 / US | |||
For all designated states Wang, Xiaobo Acea Biosciences 11585 Sorrento Valley Road, Suite 103 San Diego, Ca 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abassi, Yama A. Acea Biosciences 11585 Sorrento Valley Road, Suite 103 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 02 /
Atienza, Josephine Acea Biosciences 11585 Sorrento Valley Road, Suite 103 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 03 /
Xu, Xiao Acea Biosciences 11585 Sorrento Valley Road, Suite 103 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 04 /
Wang, Xiaobo Acea Biosciences 11585 Sorrento Valley Road, Suite 103 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2007/47] |
Former [2007/26] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/42] | Novagraaf IP 3 Avenue de l'Opéra 75001 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/26] | Breese Derambure Majerowicz 38, avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 05812268.0 | 27.09.2005 | [2007/26] | WO2005US34561 | Priority number, date | US20040613749P | 27.09.2004 Original published format: US 613749 P | US20040613872P | 27.09.2004 Original published format: US 613872 P | US20040614601P | 29.09.2004 Original published format: US 614601 P | US20040987732 | 12.11.2004 Original published format: US 987732 | WO2004US37696 | 12.11.2004 Original published format: PCT/US2004/037696 | US20040630071P | 22.11.2004 Original published format: US 630071 P | US20040630131P | 22.11.2004 Original published format: US 630131 P | US20040630809P | 24.11.2004 Original published format: US 630809 P | US20040633019P | 03.12.2004 Original published format: US 633019 P | US20050647189P | 26.01.2005 Original published format: US 647189 P | US20050647159P | 26.01.2005 Original published format: US 647159 P | US20050647075P | 26.01.2005 Original published format: US 647075 P | US20050055639 | 09.02.2005 Original published format: US 55639 | WO2005US04481 | 09.02.2005 Original published format: PCT/US2005/004481 | US20050653904P | 17.02.2005 Original published format: US 653904 P | US20050660829P | 10.03.2005 Original published format: US 660829 P | US20050660898P | 10.03.2005 Original published format: US 660898 P | US20050673678P | 21.04.2005 Original published format: US 673678 P | US20050689422P | 10.06.2005 Original published format: US 689422 P | US20050198831 | 04.08.2005 Original published format: US 198831 | WO2005US27943 | 04.08.2005 Original published format: PCT/US2005/027943 | WO2005US27891 | 04.08.2005 Original published format: PCT/US2005/027891 | US20050197994 | 04.08.2005 Original published format: US 197994 | [2007/38] |
Former [2007/26] | US20040613749P | 27.09.2004 | |
US20040613872P | 27.09.2004 | ||
US20040614601P | 29.09.2004 | ||
US20040987732 | 12.11.2004 | ||
WO2004US37696 | 12.11.2004 | ||
US20040630071P | 22.11.2004 | ||
US20040630131P | 22.11.2004 | ||
US20040630809P | 24.11.2004 | ||
US20040633019P | 03.12.2004 | ||
US20050647189P | 26.01.2005 | ||
US20050647159P | 26.01.2005 | ||
US20050647075P | 26.01.2005 | ||
US20050055639 | 09.02.2005 | ||
WO2005US04481 | 09.02.2005 | ||
US20050653904P | 17.02.2005 | ||
US20050660829P | 10.03.2005 | ||
US20050660898P | 10.03.2005 | ||
US20050673678P | 21.04.2005 | ||
US20050689422P | 10.06.2005 | ||
US20050198831 | 04.08.2005 | ||
US20050197994 | 04.08.2005 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006036952 | Date: | 06.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1800312 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.12.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G11C11/00, C12M1/34, H01M4/50, G01N29/036 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
G01N29/036 (EP);
G01N2291/0257 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/26] | G11C11/00, C12M1/34, H01M4/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE ÜBERWACHUNG VON ZELLADHÄSION UND -VERTEILUNG MITHILFE DES RT-CES-SYSTEMS | [2007/26] | English: | DYNAMIC MONITORING OF CELL ADHESION AND SPREADING USING THE RT-CES SYSTEM | [2007/26] | French: | SURVEILLANCE DYNAMIQUE DE L'ADHESION ET DE LA DIFFUSION CELLULAIRE A L'AIDE DU SYSTEME RT-CES | [2007/26] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 11.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/41] | 21.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2004010103 (ACEA BIOSCIENCES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-13,15,16 * claims 1-6,10-12,30,39,48 * * paragraphs [0024] , [0066] , [0075] , [0119] , [0244]; figures 1A,19 * [I] 14 | International search | [X]US2004146849 (HUANG MINGXIAN [US], et al); | [Y]US6051422 (KOVACS GREGORY T A [US], et al); | [Y]US6132683 (SUGIHARA HIROKAZU [JP], et al); | [Y]US2003157587 (GOMEZ RAFAEL [US], et al); | [Y]US2003166015 (ZAROWITZ MICHAEL A [US], et al) |