EP1815520 - METHOD OF FORMING A SILICON-ON-INSULATOR SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE WITH SILICON LAYER HAVING DEFFERENT CRYSTAL ORIENTATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/32] | SILICON-ON-INSULATOR SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE WITH SILICON LAYER HAVING DEFFERENT CRYSTAL ORIENTATIONS AND METHOD OF FORMING THE SILICON-ON-INSULATOR SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | ||
[2011/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. One AMD Place Mail Stop 68 P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale CA 94088-3453 / US | [2008/36] |
Former [2007/32] | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. One AMD Place, Mail Stop 68, P.O.Box 9453 Sunnyvale, CA 94088-3453 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAITE, Andrew, M. 3603 Chelsea Cove South Hopewell Junction, NY 12533-6935 / US | 02 /
CHEEK, Jon 2910 Kinloch Drive Cedar Park, TX 78613 / US | [2007/38] |
Former [2007/32] | 01 /
WAITE, Andrew, M. 3F Surrey Lane Wappingers Falls, NY 12590 / GB | ||
02 /
CHEEK, Jon 2910 Kinloch Drive Cedar Park, TX 78613 / US | Representative(s) | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Brookes Batchellor LLP 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | ||
Former [2009/31] | Brookes Batchellor LLP 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | ||
Former [2007/32] | Brookes Batchellor LLP 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05812444.7 | 12.10.2005 | [2007/32] | WO2005US36777 | Priority number, date | US20040976780 | 01.11.2004 Original published format: US 976780 | [2007/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006049833 | Date: | 11.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1815520 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1815520 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/336, H01L29/04, H01L29/786, H01L27/12, H01L21/84, H01L21/762 | [2011/41] | CPC: |
H01L21/84 (EP,US);
H01L27/12 (KR);
H01L27/1203 (EP,US);
H01L29/045 (EP,US);
H01L29/66772 (EP,US);
H01L29/78654 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/32] | H01L27/12, H01L21/84, H01L21/762 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2008/06] |
Former [2007/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES SILIZIUM-AUF-ISOLATOR-HALBLEITERBAUELEMENTS MIT EINER SILIZIUMSCHICHT MIT VERSCHIEDENEN KRISTALLORIENTIERUNGEN | [2011/41] | English: | METHOD OF FORMING A SILICON-ON-INSULATOR SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE WITH SILICON LAYER HAVING DEFFERENT CRYSTAL ORIENTATIONS | [2011/41] | French: | PROCEDE DESTINE A FORMER UN DISPOSITIF A SEMI-CONDUCTEUR SILICIUM SUR ISOLANT AVEC COUCHE DE SILICIUM PRESENTANT DES ORIENTATIONS CRISTALLINES DIFFERENTES | [2011/41] |
Former [2007/32] | SILIZIUM-AUF-ISOLATOR-HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT MIT EINER SILIZIUMSCHICHT MIT VERSCHIEDENEN KRISTALLORIENTIERUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG DES SILIZIUM-AUF-ISOLATOR-HALBLEITERBAUELEMENTS | ||
Former [2007/32] | SILICON-ON-INSULATOR SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE WITH SILICON LAYER HAVING DEFFERENT CRYSTAL ORIENTATIONS AND METHOD OF FORMING THE SILICON-ON-INSULATOR SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | ||
Former [2007/32] | DISPOSITIF A SEMI-CONDUCTEUR SILICIUM SUR ISOLANT AVEC COUCHE DE SILICIUM PRESENTANT DES ORIENTATIONS CRISTALLINES DIFFERENTES ET PROCEDE DESTINE A FORMER CE DISPOSITIF A SEMI-CONDUCTEUR SILICIUM SUR ISOLANT | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 31.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.01.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 24.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 21.03.2011 | Appeal received | 23.05.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.07.2011 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]US6830962 (GUARINI KATHRYN W [US], et al) [PX] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [PX]US6949420 (YAMASHITA TENKO [US]) [PX] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2005124871 (IBM [US], et al) [E] 1-4,6,7,10 * the whole document *; | [PXA]WO2005057631 (IBM [US], et al) [PX] 1-5 * figures 5,6 * * figure 8 * [PA] 6-10; | [X]US2004195646 (YEO YEE-CHIA [TW], et al) [X] 1-5 * abstract *; | [X]EP0331811 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]JPS60154548 ; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851217), vol. 009, no. 321, Database accession no. (E - 367), & JP60154548 A 19850814 (FUJITSU KK) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | [A] - YANG M ET AL, "High Performance CMOS Fabricated on Hybrid Substrate With Different Crystal Orientations", INTERNATIONAL ELECTRON DEVICES MEETING 2003. IEDM. TECHNICAL DIGEST. WASHINGTON, DC, DEC 8 - 10, 2003, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20031208), ISBN 0-7803-7872-5, pages 453 - 456, XP010684050 [A] 1-10 * abstract * |