EP1819404 - METAL OXIDE NANOPARTICLES FOR SMOKE CLEARING AND FIRE SUPPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nanoscale Corporation 1310 Research Park Drive Manhattan, KS 66502 / US | [2008/28] |
Former [2007/34] | For all designated states Nanoscale Materials, Inc. 1310 Research Park Drive Manhattan, KS 66502 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MULUKUTLA, Ravi 2100 Fox Meadows Manhattan, KS 66503 / US | 02 /
MALCHESKY, Paul, S. 239 Barrington Ridge Painesville, OH 44077 / US | 03 /
MAGHIRANG, Ronaldo 1606 Little Kitten Avenue Manhattan, KS 66502 / US | 04 /
KLABUNDE, John, S. 2123 North View Drive Manhattan, KS 66502 / US | 05 /
KLABUNDE, Kenneth, J. 105 Notre Dame Circle Manhattan, KS 66503 / US | 06 /
KOPER, Olga 3004 Geneva Drive Manhattan, KS 66502 / US | [2007/34] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2007/34] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05812645.9 | 18.10.2005 | [2007/34] | WO2005US37228 | Priority number, date | US20040619830P | 18.10.2004 Original published format: US 619830 P | US20040620517P | 20.10.2004 Original published format: US 620517 P | [2007/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006044784 | Date: | 27.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1819404 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.11.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A62D1/00 | [2007/34] | CPC: |
A62D1/0007 (EP,US);
A62D1/0014 (EP,US);
C09K21/02 (EP,US);
C09K21/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METALLOXIDNANOPARTIKEL ZUR RAUCH- UND BRANDBEKÄMPFUNG | [2007/34] | English: | METAL OXIDE NANOPARTICLES FOR SMOKE CLEARING AND FIRE SUPPRESSION | [2007/34] | French: | NANOPARTICULES D'OXYDE METALLIQUE UTILISEES DANS LA DISSIPATION DES FUMEES ET L'EXTINCTION DES INCENDIES | [2007/34] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2007 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/34] | 23.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/34] | 02.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN2566933Y (WU SHAOZHI [CN]) [X] 1-5,12 * abstract *; | [X]WO2004037387 (BAYER CHARLENE W [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * page 10, line 11 * * page 23, lines 18-31 * * abstract *; | [XP]US2004260139 (KLABUNDE KENNETH [US], et al) [XP] 1-5,12,13 * page 2, paragraphs 0013,0020 * * page 3, paragraph 0028 *; | [A]US2003226443 (RAJAGOPALAN SHYAMALA [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US6093236 (KLABUNDE KENNETH J [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US6417423 (KOPER OLGA [US], et al); | [X] - "FASTACT (Chemical Hazard Containment And Neutralization System)", TECHNICAL REPORT, NANOSCALE MATERIALS, INC., XP008072075 |