EP1820245 - FRAME AND METHOD OF COMPRISING ONE OR MORE ELASTIC MODULES FOR CABLE ENTRIES, PIPE PENETRATIONS OR THE LIKE. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roxtec AB Box 540 371 23 Karlskrona / SE | [2007/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KREUTZ, Tomas Ringövägen 76A S-371 64 Lyckeby / SE | [2007/34] | Representative(s) | Karlsson, Leif Gunnar Börje Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [2017/04] |
Former [2007/34] | Karlsson, Leif Gunnar Börje Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 05813326.5 | 06.12.2005 | [2007/34] | WO2005SE01840 | Priority number, date | SE20040002978 | 08.12.2004 Original published format: SE 0402978 | [2007/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006062469 | Date: | 15.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1820245 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1820245 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 15.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/08, F16L5/14, F16L5/08, H02G3/22, H02G15/013 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
H02G3/22 (EP,KR,SE,US);
F16L5/08 (EP,SE,US);
F16L5/14 (EP,US);
H02G15/013 (EP,SE,US);
H02G3/083 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/34] | H02G3/22, F16L5/08, H02G15/013 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/04] |
Former [2007/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | RAHMEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM UMFASSE VON EINEM ODER MEHREREN ELASTISCHEN MODULEN FÜR KABELEINFÜHRUNGEN,ROHRDURCHFÜHRUNGEN UND DERGLEICHEN | [2007/34] | English: | FRAME AND METHOD OF COMPRISING ONE OR MORE ELASTIC MODULES FOR CABLE ENTRIES, PIPE PENETRATIONS OR THE LIKE. | [2007/34] | French: | CADRE ET PROCEDE COMPRENANT UN OU PLUSIEURS MODULES ELASTIQUES POUR ENTREES DE CABLES, ENTREES DE CONDUITS OU ANALOGUE | [2007/34] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 26.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/34] | 03.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.05.2016 | Observations by third parties | 28.07.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.12.2005 | CY | 25.01.2017 | CZ | 25.01.2017 | EE | 25.01.2017 | LT | 25.01.2017 | LV | 25.01.2017 | MC | 25.01.2017 | PL | 25.01.2017 | RO | 25.01.2017 | SE | 25.01.2017 | SI | 25.01.2017 | SK | 25.01.2017 | TR | 25.01.2017 | BG | 25.04.2017 | GR | 26.04.2017 | IS | 25.05.2017 | PT | 25.05.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 06.12.2005 | |
CY | 25.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 06.12.2005 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 25.01.2017 | |
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 25.01.2017 | |
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 25.01.2017 | |
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 25.01.2017 | |
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | LT | 25.01.2017 | |
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2171531 (TELEMECANIQUE ELECTRIQUE [FR]); | [X]GB2140114 (HAUFF WERNER); | [A]DE3828012 (DOEPFL RUDOLF GMBH [AT]); | [X]US6149164 (KREUTZ THOMAS [SE]) | other | US6149164 |