EP1833857 - APPARATUS FOR THE GAS-PHASE POLYMERIZATION OF OLEFINS, IN PARTICULAR ETHYLENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basell Polyolefine GmbH Brühler Strasse 60 50389 Wesseling / DE | [2007/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERRMANN, Eberhard Radolfstrasse 7c 67227 Frankental / DE | 02 /
SPERBER, Axel Dammstücker Weg 1 67067 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
HECKER, Manfred Dreischlaegerstrasse 30 53577 Neustadt Wied / DE | 04 /
KARER, Rainer Oskar-Schlemmer-Ring 48 67657 Kaiserlautern / DE | 05 /
BERHALTER, Klaus Brenigerstrasse 2 53332 Bornheim Dersdorf / DE | 06 /
DE LANGE, Paulus Starenweg 5 50389 Wesseling / DE | 07 /
HALPAP, Jörg Korpitzsch 8 04703 Bockelwitz / DE | 08 /
AHMADZADE-YOUSSEFI, Cyrus Am Beethovenpark 15 50935 Köln / DE | [2007/38] | Application number, filing date | 05813362.0 | 09.11.2005 | [2007/38] | WO2005EP11956 | Priority number, date | DE20041054628 | 11.11.2004 Original published format: DE102004054628 | US20040633330P | 03.12.2004 Original published format: US 633330 P | [2007/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006050919 | Date: | 18.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1833857 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1833857 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00, B01J8/00, C08F2/34 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
B01J8/1872 (EP,US);
B01J8/00 (KR);
B01J8/0055 (EP,US);
B01J8/24 (EP,US);
B04C5/081 (EP,US);
C08F10/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08F10/02 (EP,US);
C08F2/02 (KR);
C08F2/34 (KR);
C08F6/02 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00256 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00274 (EP,US);
C08F110/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F2/34 (US,EP);
C08F10/02, C08F2/34 (US,EP);
C08F6/02, C08L23/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR GASPHASENPOLYMERISATION VON OLEFINEN, INSBESONDERE ETHYLEN | [2007/38] | English: | APPARATUS FOR THE GAS-PHASE POLYMERIZATION OF OLEFINS, IN PARTICULAR ETHYLENE | [2007/38] | French: | APPAREIL POUR LA POLYMÉRISATION D'OLÉFINES, EN PARTICULIER DE L'ÉTHYLÈNE, EN PHASE GAZEUSE | [2007/38] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 12.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.05.2010 | CZ | 12.05.2010 | DK | 12.05.2010 | EE | 12.05.2010 | FI | 12.05.2010 | IT | 12.05.2010 | LT | 12.05.2010 | LV | 12.05.2010 | NL | 12.05.2010 | PL | 12.05.2010 | RO | 12.05.2010 | SE | 12.05.2010 | SI | 12.05.2010 | SK | 12.05.2010 | TR | 12.05.2010 | CY | 19.05.2010 | BG | 12.08.2010 | GR | 13.08.2010 | ES | 23.08.2010 | IS | 12.09.2010 | PT | 13.09.2010 | GB | 09.11.2010 | IE | 09.11.2010 | LU | 09.11.2010 | HU | 13.11.2010 | CH | 30.11.2010 | LI | 30.11.2010 | MC | 30.11.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BG | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
TR | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
GB | 09.11.2010 | ||
IE | 09.11.2010 | ||
LU | 09.11.2010 | ||
HU | 13.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BG | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
GB | 09.11.2010 | ||
IE | 09.11.2010 | ||
LU | 09.11.2010 | ||
HU | 13.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BG | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
GB | 09.11.2010 | ||
IE | 09.11.2010 | ||
HU | 13.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BG | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
GB | 09.11.2010 | ||
IE | 09.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
GB | 09.11.2010 | ||
IE | 09.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
IE | 09.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/02] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 12.05.2010 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4486207 (BAILLIE LLOYD A [US]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0301872 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5771844 (DIETZ DAVID H [US]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0972572 (RIBERA SALCEDO ROMUALDO LUIS [PT]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]WO03080252 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [PX]US2004236040 (MIHAN SHAHRAM [DE], et al) [PX] 1-10* the whole document *; | [PX]US2005126394 (REILING VINCE [FR]) [PX] 1-10 * the whole document * |