EP1831632 - DIMENSIONALLY-OPTIMISED DEVICE FOR THE EXCHANGE OF HEAT AND METHOD FOR OPTIMISATION OF THE DIMENSIONS OF DEVICES FOR THE EXCHANGE OF HEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEN-SALHA, Mourad Wörrishofener Strasse 33 70372 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
DÜRR, Gottfried Nachsommerweg 29 70437 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
KRANICH, Michael Friedrich-Breining-Strasse 10 74354 Besigheim / DE | 04 /
SEEWALD, Wolfgang Werastrasse 81 A 70190 Stuttgart / DE | 05 /
STAFFA, Karl-Heinz Balinger Strasse 79 70567 Stuttgart / DE | 06 /
WALTER, Christoph Werner-Haas-Weg 32 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/37] | Representative(s) | Grauel, Andreas, et al Grauel IP Patentanwaltskanzlei Wartbergstrasse 14 70191 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Grauel, Andreas, et al Grauel IP Patentanwaltskanzlei Presselstrasse 10 70191 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2010/52] | Grauel, Andreas, et al Behr GmbH & Co. KG Intellectual Property, G-IP Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2007/37] | Mantel, Berthold Friedrich Behr GmbH & Co. KG Intellectual Property, G-IP Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 05813950.2 | 17.11.2005 | [2007/37] | WO2005EP12304 | Priority number, date | DE20041056557 | 23.11.2004 Original published format: DE102004056557 | [2007/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006056360 | Date: | 01.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1831632 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F28D1/053, F25B39/02 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
F28F1/126 (EP,US);
F25B39/022 (EP,US);
F25B9/008 (EP,US);
F28D1/05383 (EP,US);
F25B2309/061 (EP,US);
F25B2500/01 (EP,US);
F28D2021/0085 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIMENSIONSOPTIMIERTE VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSTAUSCH VON WÄRME UND VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMIERUNG DER DIMENSIONEN VON VORRICHTUNGEN ZUM AUSTAUSCH VON WÄRME | [2007/37] | English: | DIMENSIONALLY-OPTIMISED DEVICE FOR THE EXCHANGE OF HEAT AND METHOD FOR OPTIMISATION OF THE DIMENSIONS OF DEVICES FOR THE EXCHANGE OF HEAT | [2007/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ECHANGE DE CHALEUR A DIMENSIONS OPTIMISEES ET PRODECE POUR OPTIMISER LES DIMENSIONS DE DISPOSITIFS D'ECHANGE DE CHALEUR | [2007/37] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 23.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/48] | 09.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.02.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2055549 (MODINE ARTHUR B) [Y] 13,14 * the whole document * [A] 24-28; | [X]DE2506631 (CHAUSSON USINES SA) [X] 1-4,6-10,15-20,24-28 * the whole document *; | [X]US5311935 (YAMAMOTO MICHIYASU [JP], et al) [X] 1-10,15-17,19-21,23-28 * the whole document *; | [X]US5482112 (SASAKI HIRONAKA [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10,15-17,20,23-28* the whole document *; | [X]DE19719252 (VALEO KLIMATECH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-10,15-28 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002179295 (PALANCHON LAURENT [FR]) [X] 1-10,15-28 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] - [0010] - [0016] - [0019] - [0030] - [0035]; figure 1 *; | [XY]US2003102113 (MEMORY STEPHEN [US], et al) [X] 1-12,15-18,20,22,23 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [0012] , [0013] , [0023] - [0029]; figures 2-5 * [Y] 13,14; | [X]DE10260107 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-12,15-18,20-23 * paragraphs [0017] , [0041] , [0062] , [0075] , [0184] * |