EP1834027 - DOOR LOCK FOR THE DOOR OF A HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.06.2018 Database last updated on 28.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2018 | Revocation of patent | published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states emz-Hanauer GmbH & Co. KGaA Siemensstrasse 1 92507 Nabburg / DE | [2007/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPIESSL, Georg Altendorfer Strasse 9 92540 Willhof-Altendorf / DE | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/38] | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05814595.4 | 30.11.2005 | [2007/38] | WO2005EP12778 | Priority number, date | DE20041060607 | 16.12.2004 Original published format: DE102004060607 | [2007/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006063684 | Date: | 22.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1834027 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1834027 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/14, D06F37/42, A47L15/42, H01H9/22 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
H01H9/226 (EP,KR,US);
D06F39/14 (EP,KR,US);
A47L15/4259 (EP,KR,US);
D06F34/20 (EP,KR,US);
D06F37/42 (EP,KR,US);
F24C15/022 (EP);
A47L2501/22 (EP,KR,US);
D06F2103/40 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S292/69 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | IT, PL, TR [2008/41] |
Former [2008/39] | DE, IT, PL, TR | ||
Former [2008/33] | IT, PL, TR | ||
Former [2008/03] | DE, IT, PL, TR | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TÜRVERRIEGELUNG FÜR EINE TÜR EINES HAUSHALTSGERÄTS | [2007/38] | English: | DOOR LOCK FOR THE DOOR OF A HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE | [2007/38] | French: | SERRURE DE PORTE POUR LA PORTE D'UN APPAREIL MENAGER | [2007/38] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 30.08.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK | 20.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.10.2009
03.11.2009
ADMISSIBLE Illinois Tool Works, Inc. 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US Opponent's representative Plebani, Rinaldo, et al, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | 02
20.10.2009
13.06.2017
WITHDRAWN Elettrotecnica Rold Srl Via della Merlata, 1 20014 Nerviano Milano / IT Opponent's representative Borsano, Corrado, et al, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | 03
21.10.2009
03.11.2009
ADMISSIBLE BITRON S.p.A. Corso Principe Oddone, 18 10122 Torino / IT Opponent's representative Vanzini, Christian Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2017/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.10.2009
03.11.2009
ADMISSIBLE Illinois Tool Works, Inc. 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US Opponent's representative Plebani, Rinaldo, et al, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | ||
02
20.10.2009
13.06.2017
WITHDRAWN Elettrotecnica Rold Srl Via della Merlata, 1 20014 Nerviano Milano / IT Opponent's representative Borsano, Corrado, et al, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | |||
03
21.10.2009
03.11.2009
ADMISSIBLE BITRON S.p.A. Corso Principe Oddone, 18 10122 Torino / IT Opponent's representative Vanzini, Christian Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | |||
Former [2017/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.10.2009
03.11.2009
ADMISSIBLE Illinois Tool Works, Inc. 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US Opponent's representative Plebani, Rinaldo, et al, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | ||
02
20.10.2009
13.06.2017
WITHDRAWN Elettrotecnica Rold Srl Via della Merlata, 1 20014 Nerviano Milano / IT Opponent's representative Borsano, Corrado, et al, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | |||
03
21.10.2009
03.11.2009
ADMISSIBLE BITRON S.p.A. Corso Principe Oddone, 18 10122 Torino / IT Opponent's representative Quinterno, Giuseppe Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | |||
Former [2014/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.10.2009
03.11.2009
ADMISSIBLE Illinois Tool Works, Inc. 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US Opponent's representative Plebani, Rinaldo, et al, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | ||
02
20.10.2009
03.11.2009
ADMISSIBLE Elettrotecnica Rold Srl Via della Merlata, 1 20014 Nerviano Milano / IT Opponent's representative Borsano, Corrado, et al, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | |||
03
21.10.2009
03.11.2009
ADMISSIBLE BITRON S.p.A. Corso Principe Oddone, 18 10122 Torino / IT Opponent's representative Quinterno, Giuseppe Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | |||
Former [2009/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.10.2009
Illinois Tool Works, Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US Opponent's representative Plebani, Rinaldo, et al, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | ||
02
20.10.2009
WITHDRAWN Elettrotecnica Rold Srl Via della Merlata, 1 20014 Nerviano Milano / IT Opponent's representative Borsano, Corrado, et al, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | |||
03
21.10.2009
BITRON S.p.A. Corso Principe Oddone, 18 10122 Torino / IT Opponent's representative Quinterno, Giuseppe Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | 25.11.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.06.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.04.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.07.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 10.04.2018 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2018/29] | Appeal following opposition | 13.08.2013 | Appeal received No. T1781/13 | 11.11.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.04.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 10.04.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.04.2018 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2782793 (BRADLEY ROBERT O, et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,10-12 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 37 * * column 5, lines 33-70; figures 1-6 *; | [X]DE2059318 (SIEMENS ELEKTROGERAETE GMBH, et al) [X] 1-4,6-10,12 * page 4, paragraph L - page 7, paragraph L; figure - *; | [X]US4074545 (CASE RICHARD P) [X] 1,4,6,8,10 * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 22; figure - *; | [X]DE3423083 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [X] 1,4,6,8-10 * page 3, paragraph 4 - page 5, paragraph L; figure . *; | [X]US4718705 (CASE RICHARD P [US]) [X] 1-4,6-8,10-12 * column 3, line 60 - column 6, line 53; figure - *; | [X]EP0483697 (YMOS AG IND PRODUKTE [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-12 * column 2, line 43 - column 5, line 57; figure - *; | [A]EP1388604 (ELLENBERGER & POENSGEN [DE]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 5, paragraph 21 - column 7, paragraph 29; figures 1,3-6 *; | [A]EP1433893 (BITRON SPA [IT]) [A] 1-12* column 2, paragraph 5 - column 7, paragraph 45; figures 1-12 *; | [PX]WO2005106099 (MARQUARDT GMBH [DE], et al) [PX] 1-12 * page 6, paragraph L - page 7, paragraph L; figures 7-9; claim 7 * |