EP1809558 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR POSITIONING STRIPS AND ROLLS IN ORDER TO CONNECT SAME TO AN UNWINDING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.11.2011 [2011/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monomatic (Société par Actions Simplifiée) 48, Rue de l'Engelbreit 67200 Strassbourg / FR | [2008/23] |
Former [2007/30] | For all designated states Monomatic (Société Anonyme) 48, Rue de l'Engelbreit 67200 Strasbourg / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MULLER, Bernard 2, impasse du Foin F-67410 Drusenheim / FR | [2007/30] | Representative(s) | Nuss, Pierre, et al Cabinet Nuss 10 Rue Jacques Kablé 67080 Strasbourg Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/30] | Nuss, Pierre, et al Cabinet Nuss 10, rue Jacques Kablé 67080 Strasbourg Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 05814793.5 | 04.11.2005 | [2007/30] | WO2005FR02753 | Priority number, date | FR20040011993 | 10.11.2004 Original published format: FR 0411993 | [2007/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006051194 | Date: | 18.05.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1809558 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1809558 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/17] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1809558 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65H19/12 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
B65H19/1852 (EP,US);
B65H19/126 (EP,US);
B65H23/0216 (EP);
B65H2557/51 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR POSITIONIERUNG VON STREIFEN UND ROLLEN FÜR DEREN VERBINDUNG MIT EINER ABWICKELMASCHINE | [2007/30] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR POSITIONING STRIPS AND ROLLS IN ORDER TO CONNECT SAME TO AN UNWINDING MACHINE | [2007/30] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE POSITIONNEMENT DE BANDES ET DE BOBINES EN VUE DU RACCORDEMENT SUR UNE MACHINE A DEROULER | [2007/30] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 14.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.04.2008 | CY | 23.04.2008 | CZ | 23.04.2008 | DK | 23.04.2008 | EE | 23.04.2008 | IE | 23.04.2008 | LT | 23.04.2008 | LV | 23.04.2008 | PL | 23.04.2008 | PT | 23.04.2008 | RO | 23.04.2008 | SI | 23.04.2008 | SK | 23.04.2008 | TR | 23.04.2008 | BG | 23.07.2008 | GR | 24.07.2008 | IS | 23.08.2008 | HU | 24.10.2008 | [2011/46] |
Former [2011/02] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
CY | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
LT | 23.04.2008 | ||
LV | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
TR | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
GR | 24.07.2008 | ||
IS | 23.08.2008 | ||
HU | 24.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/40] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
CY | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
LT | 23.04.2008 | ||
LV | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
TR | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
IS | 23.08.2008 | ||
HU | 24.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
LT | 23.04.2008 | ||
LV | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
IS | 23.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
LT | 23.04.2008 | ||
LV | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
RO | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
IS | 23.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
LT | 23.04.2008 | ||
LV | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
IS | 23.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
LV | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
IS | 23.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
LV | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
IS | 23.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/51] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
LV | 23.04.2008 | ||
PL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SI | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 23.04.2008 | |
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 23.04.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4131206 (KAWADA TOMOSHI, et al) [A] 1,5* column 4, line 24 - column 5, line 16; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5133511 (MACK HORST [DE], et al) [A] 1,5 * column 3, line 13 - column 4, line 22; figure 2 * * column 5, line 60 - column 7, line 8 *; | [A]US6007017 (VORWERK FRANZ JOSEF [DE]) [A] 1,5 * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 62; figure 1 * |