EP1817883 - PROVISIONING OF E-MAIL SETTINGS FOR A MOBILE TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.12.2014 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEVEN NETWORKS INTERNATIONAL OY Paciuksenkatu 29 00270 Helsinki / FI | [2007/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACKHOLM, Ari Koivistontie 14 E FI-02140 Espoo / FI | 02 /
SALORINNE, Seppo Juustilanpolku 7 FI-00950 Helsinki / FI | 03 /
KETONEN, Marko Toinen linja 11 B 57 FI-00530 Helsinki / FI | 04 /
VUORNOS, Lauri 2757 Polk street, 5 San Francisco, CA 94109 / US | 05 /
HEINONEN, Jussi 4 Mawson Road Cambridge CB1 2EA / GB | [2008/13] |
Former [2007/33] | 01 /
BACKHOLM, Ari Koivistontie 14 E FI-02140 Espoo / FI | ||
02 /
SALORINNE, Seppo Juustilanpolku 7 FI-00950 Helsinki / FI | |||
03 /
KETONEN, Marko Toinen linja 11 B 57 FI-00530 Helsinki / FI | |||
04 /
VUORNOS, Lauri 2757 Polk street, 5 San Francisco, CA 94109 / US | |||
05 /
HEINONEN, Jussi 41 Mawson Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB1 / GB | Representative(s) | Leach, James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/41] | Leach, James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2013/40] | Leach, James Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2007/33] | Virkkala, Jukka Antero Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 05815115.0 | 01.12.2005 | [2007/33] | WO2005FI50441 | Priority number, date | US20050651081P | 09.02.2005 Original published format: US 651081 P | FI20040005466 | 03.12.2004 Original published format: FI 20045466 | [2007/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006058967 | Date: | 08.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1817883 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 08.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/58 | [2007/33] | CPC: |
H04L51/58 (EP);
H04L51/23 (EP);
H04L51/48 (EP);
H04M1/72436 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEREITSTELLUNG VON EMAIL-EINSTELLUNGEN FÜR EIN MOBILES ENDGERÄT | [2007/33] | English: | PROVISIONING OF E-MAIL SETTINGS FOR A MOBILE TERMINAL | [2007/33] | French: | FOURNITURE DE CARACTERISTIQUES DE REGLAGE DE COURRIER ELECTRONIQUE POUR UN TERMINAL MOBILE | [2007/33] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 06.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/05] | 22.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/05] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   24.02.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2004017591 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA], et al) [Y] 2-6* page 1, line 4 - page 16, line 2 *; | [IY]EP1482702 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [I] 1,7 * page 2, paragraph 1 - page 13, paragraph 117 * [Y] 2-6 | International search | [A]US6119171 (ALKHATIB HASAN S [US]); | [A]WO0130130 (NOMADIX INC [US], et al); | [A]EP1422899 (T MOBILE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]); | [A]US2004128375 (ROCKWELL RONALD M [US]); | [AP]WO2005015925 (KONINKL KPN NV [NL], et al); | [AP]WO2005020108 (TEAMON SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2004017591 | EP1482702 |