EP1836071 - TRAFFIC SIGNAL HAVING A UNIFORM LIGHT SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Lighting Solutions, LLC Nela Park, Bld. 338, 1975 Noble Road Cleveland, Ohio 44112 / US | [2011/29] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states Lumination, LLC 6180 Halle Drive Valley View, OH 44125-4635 / US | ||
Former [2007/39] | For all designated states Gelcore LLC 6180 Halle Drive Valley View, OH 44125-4635 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUBUC, Eden 1618 Jean-Baptiste, Saint-Michel Quebec J0L 2J0 / CA | [2007/39] | Representative(s) | McConchie, Connor Fraser, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [2013/12] |
Former [2007/39] | Simcox, Michael Thomas D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05815373.5 | 25.10.2005 | [2007/39] | WO2005US38466 | Priority number, date | US20040640421P | 30.12.2004 Original published format: US 640421 P | US20050682578P | 19.05.2005 Original published format: US 682578 P | [2007/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006073539 | Date: | 13.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1836071 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1836071 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.07.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q3/04, F21V15/00, F21S8/00 | [2009/26] | CPC: |
F21V5/04 (EP,US);
F21V7/0091 (EP,US);
G09F9/33 (EP,US);
F21W2111/02 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/39] | B60Q3/04, F21V15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/39] | Title | German: | LICHTSIGNALANLAGE MIT EINER GLEICHFÖRMIGEN LICHTFLÄCHE | [2007/39] | English: | TRAFFIC SIGNAL HAVING A UNIFORM LIGHT SURFACE | [2007/39] | French: | SIGNAL DE TRAFIC AYANT UNE SURFACE LUMINEUSE UNIFORME | [2007/39] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/39] | 19.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.10.2012 | 15.10.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.10.2005 | AT | 12.06.2013 | BE | 12.06.2013 | CY | 12.06.2013 | CZ | 12.06.2013 | DK | 12.06.2013 | EE | 12.06.2013 | FI | 12.06.2013 | IT | 12.06.2013 | LT | 12.06.2013 | LV | 12.06.2013 | MC | 12.06.2013 | NL | 12.06.2013 | PL | 12.06.2013 | RO | 12.06.2013 | SE | 12.06.2013 | SI | 12.06.2013 | SK | 12.06.2013 | TR | 12.06.2013 | BG | 12.09.2013 | GR | 13.09.2013 | ES | 23.09.2013 | IS | 12.10.2013 | PT | 14.10.2013 | IE | 25.10.2013 | LU | 25.10.2013 | CH | 31.10.2013 | LI | 31.10.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CY | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
TR | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
IE | 25.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CY | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
IE | 25.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
IE | 25.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | BE | 12.06.2013 | |
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 12.06.2013 | |
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 12.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004252520 (MARTINEAU PATRICK [CA], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0077]; figures 10-14 *; | [X]US2002149494 (MARTINEAU PATRICK [CA]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * paragraph [0049]; figure - *; | [A]US2004165380 (CHEW TONG FATT [MY]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9624802 (ECOLUX INC [CA]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1091167 (SWARCO FUTURIT VERKEHRSSIGNALS [AT]) [A] 1,5-6,11-12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004001459 (STUEHRENBERG GMBH ELEKTROBAU S [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US6184628 (RUTHENBERG DOUGLAS [US]); | [X]US5416679 (RUSKOUSKI CHARLES R [US], et al); | [Y]US5528474 (RONEY TROY L [US], et al); | [Y]US3629655 (FULLMER DEAN W); | [Y]US4914435 (GOULD SAMUEL [US], et al) | Examination | GB319661 | US2215900 | US6402347 | by applicant | US2004252520 |