EP1819605 - CARTON HAVING IMPROVED OPENING FEATURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graphic Packaging International, Inc. 814 Livingston Court Marietta, GA 30067 / US | [2007/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPIVEY, Raymond, Rudolph, Sr. 475 Ivey Court Mableton, GA 30126 / US | [2007/34] | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/34] | Grättinger & Partner (GbR) Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05815417.0 | 28.10.2005 | [2007/34] | WO2005US39367 | Priority number, date | US20040623497P | 29.10.2004 Original published format: US 623497 P | US20050054629 | 09.02.2005 Original published format: US 54629 | [2007/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006050316 | Date: | 11.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1819605 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1819605 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65D71/00 | [2007/34] | CPC: |
B65D71/36 (EP);
B65D2571/00141 (EP);
B65D2571/0045 (EP);
B65D2571/0058 (EP);
B65D2571/00611 (EP);
B65D2571/0066 (EP);
B65D2571/00728 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KARTON MIT VERBESSERTEN ÖFFNUNGSMERKMALEN | [2007/34] | English: | CARTON HAVING IMPROVED OPENING FEATURES | [2007/34] | French: | BOITE EN CARTON A CARACTERISTIQUES D'OUVERTURE AMELIOREES | [2007/34] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/34] | 13.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.12.2008 | BE | 10.12.2008 | CY | 10.12.2008 | CZ | 10.12.2008 | DK | 10.12.2008 | EE | 10.12.2008 | FI | 10.12.2008 | IT | 10.12.2008 | LT | 10.12.2008 | LV | 10.12.2008 | NL | 10.12.2008 | PL | 10.12.2008 | RO | 10.12.2008 | SI | 10.12.2008 | SK | 10.12.2008 | TR | 10.12.2008 | BG | 10.03.2009 | SE | 10.03.2009 | GR | 11.03.2009 | ES | 21.03.2009 | IS | 10.04.2009 | PT | 11.05.2009 | HU | 11.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IT | 10.12.2008 | ||
LT | 10.12.2008 | ||
LV | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
IS | 10.04.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
HU | 11.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IT | 10.12.2008 | ||
LT | 10.12.2008 | ||
LV | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
IS | 10.04.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/02] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
LT | 10.12.2008 | ||
LV | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
IS | 10.04.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
LT | 10.12.2008 | ||
LV | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
IS | 10.04.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 10.12.2008 | |
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
LT | 10.12.2008 | ||
LV | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | FI | 10.12.2008 | |
LT | 10.12.2008 | ||
LV | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 10.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3228582 (OSBERG STANLEY C) [X] 1,4,5,16,19,20,48 * column 2, line 20 - line 47; figures 1-4 *; | [X]FR2716437 (SOCAR [FR]) [X] 1,4,5,16,19,20,48 * page 3, line 2 - line 31; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2003192905 (SPIVEY RAYMOND RUDOLPH [US]) [X] 1-5,16-20,48 * column 3, line 17 - column 5, line 29; figures 1-5 *; | [X]US2004099558 (OLIFF JAMES R [US], et al) [X] 34-41,48 * page 1, paragraph 15 - page 3, paragraph 31; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2004188509 (HOLLEY JOHN [US]) [X] 1-5,16-20,48 * page 2, paragraph 25 - page 4, paragraph 65; figures 1-12 *; | [PDX]US2005178687 (SPIVEY RAYMOND R SR [US]) [PDX] 1,5,16,34,37-45,48 * page 2, paragraph 26 - page 4, paragraph 43; figures 1-15 *; | [PX]US2005189405 (GOMES JEAN-MANUEL [US], et al) [PX] 34,37-41,48* page 2, paragraph 28 - page 6, paragraph 67; figures 1-9 * |