EP1810306 - ACTUATING DEVICE COMPRISING KEYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/30] | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEYER, Jörg Kurzer Weg 4 49419 Wagenfeld / DE | 02 /
GIEFER, Andreas Stettiner Strasse 2 49448 Lemförde / DE | [2007/30] | Application number, filing date | 05815478.2 | 08.11.2005 | [2007/30] | WO2005DE02009 | Priority number, date | DE20041054617 | 11.11.2004 Original published format: DE102004054617 | [2007/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006050703 | Date: | 18.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1810306 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1810306 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01H13/72, H01H9/20, F16H59/12 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
F16H59/12 (EP,US);
H01H13/72 (EP,US);
H01H9/20 (EP,US);
H01H13/74 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2007/51] |
Former [2007/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BETÄTIGUNGSEINRICHTUNG MIT TASTEN | [2007/30] | English: | ACTUATING DEVICE COMPRISING KEYS | [2007/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ACTIONNEMENT A TOUCHES | [2007/30] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 12.06.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.08.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 31.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 16.01.2013 | ES | 27.04.2013 | [2013/36] |
Former [2013/34] | SE | 16.01.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH05109336 ; | [X]US3448417 (SCHILLER GERALD, et al) [X] 1-5,8-12 * column 4, line 31 - line 42 * * column 5, line 7 - line 42 * * column 6, line 20 - line 73 * * column 8, line 32 - line 52 * * figure - *; | [X]US3768061 (PEIL W, et al) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]GB1412808 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]DE3025174 (FELTEN & GUILLEAUME CARLSWERK [DE]) [X] 1-5,8,9,12 * page 6, paragraph L; figure - *; | [X]EP1251297 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1,3-5,8,9,16 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028]; figure - *; | [A]DE10260168 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 10* the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930823), vol. 017, no. 460, Database accession no. (E - 1419), & JP05109336 A 19930430 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,3-5,8,9 * abstract * |