EP1825510 - METHOD FOR COLLECTIVELY PRODUCING A SUPERIMPOSED ELEMENT MICROSTRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E2V Semiconductors Avenue de Rochepleine 38120 Saint Egreve / FR | For all designated states Tracit Technologies Parc Technologique des Fontaines Chemin des Franques 38190 Bernin / FR | [2009/29] |
Former [2007/35] | For all designated states E2V SEMICONDUCTORS Avenue de Rochepleine 38120 Saint Egreve / FR | ||
For all designated states Tracit Technologies Parc Technologique des Fontaines Chemin des Franques 38190 Bernin / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROMMEVEAUX, Philippe 6 LOT LES VOUTES F-38500 COUBLEVIE / FR | 02 /
ASPAR, Bernard 110 Lot Le Hameau des Ayes F-38140 RIVES / FR | [2007/35] | Representative(s) | Guérin, Michel Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/35] | Guérin, Michel Marks & Clerk France 31-33 Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 05815827.0 | 08.12.2005 | [2007/35] | WO2005EP56599 | Priority number, date | FR20040013345 | 15.12.2004 Original published format: FR 0413345 | [2007/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006063961 | Date: | 22.06.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1825510 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1825510 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/02 | [2007/35] | CPC: |
B81C1/0023 (EP,US);
H01L23/02 (KR);
H01L27/1462 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45124 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45144 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/45124, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/45144, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/10253, H01L2924/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL [2008/13] |
Former [2007/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM KOLLEKTIVEN PRODUZIEREN EINER ELEMENTÜBERLAGERUNGS-MIKROSTRUKTUR | [2007/35] | English: | METHOD FOR COLLECTIVELY PRODUCING A SUPERIMPOSED ELEMENT MICROSTRUCTURE | [2007/35] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION COLLECTIVE DE MICROSTRUCTURES A ELEMENTS SUPERPOSES | [2007/35] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 02.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6407381 (GLENN THOMAS P [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * figures 1,2,5-11 *; | [A]US5668033 (OHARA FUMIO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4,5 * figures 10-14,17,18 *; | [A]US2002170175 (AIGNER ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,5 * paragraph [0023]; figures 1-3,7a-7b,8a-8b *; | [A]WO2004008522 (AUSTRIAMICROSYSTEMS AG [AT], et al) [A] 1,3 * figure 4 *; | [A]US6555901 (YOSHIHARA SHINJI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * figures 14,17 * |