EP1841703 - BIOSOLUBLE REINFORCEMENT GLASS YARNS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Technical Fabrics Europe 130 Avenue des Follaz 73000 Chambéry / FR | [2008/09] |
Former [2007/41] | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Vetrotex France S.A. 130, avenue des Follaz 73000 Chambéry / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERTHEREAU, Anne 203 Chemin des Chassettes F-73190 CHALLES LES EAUX / FR | 02 /
GERARD, Dominique 136 Chemin des Bollonnes F-73290 LA MOTTE SERVOLEX / FR | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/41] | 01 /
BERTHEREAU, Anne 251 avenue des Thermes F-73190 CHALLES LES EAUX / FR | ||
02 /
GERARD, Dominique 136 Chemin des Bollonnes F-73290 LA MOTTE SERVOLEX / FR | Representative(s) | Jamet, Vincent Saint-Gobain Recherche Département Propriété Industrielle 39 Quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/41] | Jamet, Vincent Saint-Gobain Recherche Département Propriété Industrielle 39 Quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | Application number, filing date | 05815912.0 | 25.10.2005 | [2007/41] | WO2005FR50895 | Priority number, date | FR20040052453 | 27.10.2004 Original published format: FR 0452453 | [2007/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006045981 | Date: | 04.05.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1841703 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1841703 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/091, C03C3/118 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
C03C13/00 (EP);
C03C3/091 (EP);
C03C3/118 (EP);
C03C2213/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIOLÖSLICHE VERSTÄRKUNGSGLASFÄDEN | [2007/41] | English: | BIOSOLUBLE REINFORCEMENT GLASS YARNS | [2007/41] | French: | FILS DE VERRE DE RENFORCEMENT BIOSOLUBLES | [2007/41] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 20.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.01.2010 | CZ | 06.01.2010 | DK | 06.01.2010 | EE | 06.01.2010 | FI | 06.01.2010 | IE | 06.01.2010 | LT | 06.01.2010 | LV | 06.01.2010 | NL | 06.01.2010 | RO | 06.01.2010 | SI | 06.01.2010 | SK | 06.01.2010 | TR | 06.01.2010 | BG | 06.04.2010 | GR | 07.04.2010 | IS | 06.05.2010 | PT | 06.05.2010 | HU | 07.07.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | CY | 06.01.2010 | |
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
DK | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IE | 06.01.2010 | ||
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
GR | 07.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
HU | 07.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | CY | 06.01.2010 | |
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
DK | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IE | 06.01.2010 | ||
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
GR | 07.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/02] | CY | 06.01.2010 | |
CZ | 06.01.2010 | ||
EE | 06.01.2010 | ||
FI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IE | 06.01.2010 | ||
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
RO | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
SK | 06.01.2010 | ||
BG | 06.04.2010 | ||
GR | 07.04.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/40] | FI | 06.01.2010 | |
LT | 06.01.2010 | ||
LV | 06.01.2010 | ||
NL | 06.01.2010 | ||
SI | 06.01.2010 | ||
IS | 06.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/24] | SI | 06.01.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0412878 (SAINT GOBAIN ISOVER [FR]) [X] 1-10 * tables 1,3 *; | [X]US5945360 (HARDING FOSTER LAVERNE [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * example 6 *; | [X]WO2004011379 (EVANITE FIBER CORP [US]) [X] 1-10* examples C-5 * |