EP1824913 - IMMOBILIZING ANTI-MICROBIAL COMPOUNDS ON ELASTOMERIC ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [2009/07] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah WI 54956 / US | ||
Former [2007/35] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAGWELL, Alison, S. 4310 Wellington Place Cumming, GA 30040 / US | 02 /
KISTER, Mary, E. 5475 Memphis Street Cumming, GA 30040 / US | 03 /
JANSSEN, Robert, A. 2845 Abbottswell Drive Alpharetta, GA 30022 / US | [2007/35] | Representative(s) | Beacham, Annabel Rose, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Beacham, Annabel Rose, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2007/35] | Davies, Christopher Robert Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05816191.0 | 28.09.2005 | [2007/35] | WO2005US34904 | Priority number, date | US20040014323 | 16.12.2004 Original published format: US 14323 | [2007/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006065318 | Date: | 22.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1824913 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1824913 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/04, C08J7/12, A41D19/00 | [2007/35] | CPC: |
C08J7/12 (EP,US);
C08J7/0427 (EP,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08J2321/00 (EP,US);
C08J2483/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMMOBILISIERENDE ANTIMIKROBIELLE VERBINDUNGEN AUF ELASTOMEREN ARTIKELN | [2007/35] | English: | IMMOBILIZING ANTI-MICROBIAL COMPOUNDS ON ELASTOMERIC ARTICLES | [2007/35] | French: | IMMOBILISATION DE COMPOSES ANTI-MICROBIENS SUR DES ARTICLES ELASTOMERES | [2007/35] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 17.07.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.08.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6120587 (ELFERSY JACQUES E [US], et al) [A] 1 * claims 12,3 ** column 20, line 33 - line 53 *; | [A]EP1360940 (CHOU BELLE L [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]US2004151919 (BAGWELL ALISON S [US], et al) [A] 1 * claim 11 * |