EP1861488 - MOLD REMOVAL AND CLEANING SOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tersus Technologies L.L.C. 401 W. Main Street Suite 1400 Louisville, KY 40202 / US | [2007/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TUGGLE, Terrance, F. 912 Webster STreet Jeffersonville, IN 47130 / US | [2007/49] | Representative(s) | McCall, John Douglas WP Thompson Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | McCall, John Douglas W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | ||
Former [2009/49] | McCall, John Douglas W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | ||
Former [2007/49] | McCall, John Douglas W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool, Merseyside L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 05816286.8 | 04.11.2005 | [2007/49] | WO2005US39757 | Priority number, date | US20040625161P | 05.11.2004 Original published format: US 625161 P | US20050732667P | 03.11.2005 Original published format: US 732667 P | [2007/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006052638 | Date: | 18.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1861488 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1861488 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/395, C11D3/20, C11D7/26 | [2011/02] | CPC: |
C11D3/2075 (EP,US);
C11D3/2079 (EP,US);
C11D3/2086 (EP,US);
C11D3/3956 (EP,US);
C11D7/265 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/04] | C11D17/00 | ||
Former IPC [2007/49] | C11D3/395, C11D17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/49] | Title | German: | SCHIMMELABREINIGUNGSLÖSUNG | [2007/49] | English: | MOLD REMOVAL AND CLEANING SOLUTION | [2007/49] | French: | SOLUTION POUR NETTOYER ET ENLEVER LA MOISISSURE | [2007/49] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 10.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 10.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/49] | 04.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.10.2007 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 10.10.2007 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 10.10.2007 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 10.10.2007 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 10.10.2007 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 10.10.2007 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 10.10.2007 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 10.10.2007 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 10.10.2007 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 10.10.2007 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 10.10.2007 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 10.10.2007 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 10.10.2007 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 10.10.2007 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 10.10.2007 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 10.10.2007 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 10.10.2007 | IS   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 10.10.2007 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 10.10.2007 | LT   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 10.10.2007 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 10.10.2007 | LV   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 10.10.2007 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 10.10.2007 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 10.10.2007 | PL   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 10.10.2007 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 10.10.2007 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 10.10.2007 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 10.10.2007 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 10.10.2007 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 10.10.2007 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.10.2007 | M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.11.2005 | AT | 02.05.2012 | BE | 02.05.2012 | CY | 02.05.2012 | CZ | 02.05.2012 | DK | 02.05.2012 | EE | 02.05.2012 | FI | 02.05.2012 | IT | 02.05.2012 | LT | 02.05.2012 | LV | 02.05.2012 | NL | 02.05.2012 | PL | 02.05.2012 | RO | 02.05.2012 | SE | 02.05.2012 | SI | 02.05.2012 | SK | 02.05.2012 | TR | 02.05.2012 | BG | 02.08.2012 | GR | 03.08.2012 | ES | 13.08.2012 | IS | 02.09.2012 | PT | 03.09.2012 | GB | 04.11.2012 | IE | 04.11.2012 | LU | 04.11.2012 | CH | 30.11.2012 | FR | 30.11.2012 | LI | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
TR | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
GB | 04.11.2012 | ||
IE | 04.11.2012 | ||
LU | 04.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
TR | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
GB | 04.11.2012 | ||
IE | 04.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
GB | 04.11.2012 | ||
IE | 04.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
IE | 04.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
IE | 04.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 02.05.2012 | |
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 02.05.2012 | |
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 02.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4164477 (WHITLEY ELMER E [US]) [A] 1-14 * column 1, lines 50-61 * * column 3, line 1 - column 9, line 2 ** claim - * | International search | [X]US4941988 (WISE RODNEY M [US]); | [X]US5510047 (GABRIEL STEVEN M [US], et al) |