EP1862482 - THERMALLY DISAPPEARING RESIN PARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.08.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 4-4, Nishitemma 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8565 / JP | [2017/49] |
Former [2007/49] | For all designated states Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 4-4, Nishitemma 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8565 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OOMURA, Takahiro c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-1, Hyakuyama, Shimamotocho, Mishima-gun Osaka 6188589 / JP | 02 /
NAGATANI, Naoyuki c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-1, Hyakuyama, Shimamotocho, Mishima-gun Osaka 6188589 / JP | 03 /
INAOKA, Miki c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-1, Hyakuyama, Shimamotocho, Mishima-gun Osaka 6188589 / JP | 04 /
YAMAUCHI, Hiroshi c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 4560, Kaiseicho, Shunan-shi Yamaguchi 7460006 / JP | [2017/49] |
Former [2007/49] | 01 /
OOMURA, Takahiro c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-1, Hyakuyama, Shimamotocho, Mishima-gun Osaka 6188589 / JP | ||
02 /
NAGATANI, Naoyuki c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-1, Hyakuyama, Shimamotocho, Mishima-gun Osaka 6188589 / JP | |||
03 /
INAOKA, Miki c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-1, Hyakuyama, Shimamotocho, Mishima-gun Osaka 6188589 / JP | |||
04 /
YAMAUCHI, Hiroshi c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 4560, Kaiseicho, Shunan-shi Yamaguchi 7460006 / JP | Representative(s) | Hart-Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2017/49] |
Former [2007/49] | Hart Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05816501.0 | 13.12.2005 | [2007/49] | WO2005JP22893 | Priority number, date | JP20050085003 | 23.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005085003 | JP20050161738 | 01.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005161738 | JP20050210237 | 20.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005210237 | [2007/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006100806 | Date: | 28.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1862482 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1862482 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08F20/28, C08F290/06, C04B35/632, C04B35/634, C04B38/06, C04B38/08, C08F2/18, C08F2/22, C08J3/12, C08J9/16, C08J9/20 | [2010/21] | CPC: |
C08F290/062 (EP,US);
C08G65/48 (KR);
C04B35/195 (EP,US);
C04B35/565 (EP,US);
C04B35/584 (EP,US);
C04B35/632 (KR);
C04B35/63488 (EP,US);
C04B35/638 (EP,US);
C04B38/0615 (EP,US);
C08F222/102 (EP,US);
C08F290/06 (KR);
C08G65/22 (KR);
C08J3/12 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00793 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3409 (EP,US);
C04B2235/349 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3852 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6562 (EP,US);
C08F220/14 (EP,US);
C08F222/103 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B38/0615, C04B35/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/49] | C08F20/28, C08F290/06, C04B35/632 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/49] |
Former [2007/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | THERMISCH VERSCHWINDENDES HARZTEILCHEN | [2007/49] | English: | THERMALLY DISAPPEARING RESIN PARTICLE | [2007/49] | French: | PARTICULE DE RESINE DISPARAISSANT A LA CHALEUR | [2007/49] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2007 | Translation filed | 08.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 08.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/49] | 26.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.12.2005 | AT | 06.12.2017 | CY | 06.12.2017 | CZ | 06.12.2017 | DK | 06.12.2017 | EE | 06.12.2017 | ES | 06.12.2017 | FI | 06.12.2017 | IT | 06.12.2017 | LT | 06.12.2017 | LV | 06.12.2017 | MC | 06.12.2017 | NL | 06.12.2017 | PL | 06.12.2017 | PT | 06.12.2017 | RO | 06.12.2017 | SE | 06.12.2017 | SI | 06.12.2017 | SK | 06.12.2017 | TR | 06.12.2017 | IE | 13.12.2017 | LU | 13.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | FR | 06.02.2018 | BG | 06.03.2018 | GB | 06.03.2018 | GR | 07.03.2018 | IS | 06.04.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 13.12.2005 | |
AT | 06.12.2017 | ||
CY | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IE | 13.12.2017 | ||
LU | 13.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 06.02.2018 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GB | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 13.12.2005 | |
AT | 06.12.2017 | ||
CY | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IE | 13.12.2017 | ||
LU | 13.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 06.02.2018 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GB | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 13.12.2005 | |
AT | 06.12.2017 | ||
CY | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
IE | 13.12.2017 | ||
LU | 13.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 06.02.2018 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GB | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 13.12.2005 | |
AT | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
IE | 13.12.2017 | ||
LU | 13.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 06.02.2018 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GB | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
IE | 13.12.2017 | ||
LU | 13.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 06.02.2018 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GB | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
IE | 13.12.2017 | ||
LU | 13.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
IE | 13.12.2017 | ||
LU | 13.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
IE | 13.12.2017 | ||
LU | 13.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
IE | 13.12.2017 | ||
LU | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
LU | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
LU | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5419857 (VAN DEN SYPE JAAK S [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6,23-26 * example 1 and figures 1 & 2 * [Y] 7,10-14; | [Y]US2003220424 (SCHOFALVI KARL-HEINZ [US], et al) [Y] 7,10-14 * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0095] *; | [X]US4898902 (NAGAI TOMOAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,9,23-26 * column 1, line 67 - column 3, line 47; examples 3,4; table 1 *; | [A]JPS6411908 (ADEKA FINE CHEM KK, et al) [A] 1,23 * abstract * | International search | [X]JP2004315719 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND); | [X]JP2003104778 (NISSHIN KAGAKU KOGYO KK); | [X]JPH09175869 (LION CORP); | [X]JPH07291739 (HITACHI LTD); | [X]JPH059232 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [X]JPS60155567 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [X]JPS60122770 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND); | [Y]JP2004269308 (SUMITOMO SEIKA CHEMICALS); | [Y]JP2003095750 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPH04110007 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) | Examination | JPH02255704 | EP1375525 | by applicant | US5419857 | US2003220424 | US4898902 | JPS6411908 | JP2004315719 | JP2003104778 | JPH09175869 | JPH07291739 | JPH059232 | JPS60155567 | JPS60122770 |