EP1840202 - METHOD OF PRODUCING A FERMENTED ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE EXCELLENT IN COLOR LEVEL AND FLAVOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/40] | FERMENTED ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE EXCELLENT IN COLOR LEVEL AND FLAVOR AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME | ||
[2012/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2014 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIRIN BEER KABUSHIKI KAISHA 10-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8288 / JP | [2007/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OTA, Takehito c/o KIRIN BEER KABUSHIKI KAISHA 10-1, Shinkawa 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 1048288 / JP | 02 /
SASAKI, Nobuyoshi c/o KIRIN BEER KABUSHIKI KAISHA 10-1, Shinkawa 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 1048288 / JP | [2013/03] |
Former [2007/40] | 01 /
OTA, Takehito, KIRIN BEER KABUSHIKI KAISHA 10-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 1048288 / JP | ||
02 /
SASAKI, Nobuyoshi, KIRIN BEER KABUSHIKI KAISHA 10-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 1048288 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/40] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05816619.0 | 16.12.2005 | [2007/40] | WO2005JP23178 | Priority number, date | JP20040364837 | 16.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004364837 | JP20050031154 | 07.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005031154 | [2007/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006064919 | Date: | 22.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1840202 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1840202 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12G3/02, C12C5/04, C12C5/02 | [2012/11] | CPC: |
C12C5/04 (EP,US);
C12C5/026 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/40] | C12G3/02, C12C5/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES VERGORENEN ALKOHOLISCHEN GETRÄNKS MIT AUSGEZEICHNETEM FARBNIVEAU UND GESCHMACK | [2012/52] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING A FERMENTED ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE EXCELLENT IN COLOR LEVEL AND FLAVOR | [2012/52] | French: | MÉTHODE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE BOISSON ALCOOLISÉE FERMENTÉE PRÉSENTANT D'EXCELLENTES PROPRIÉTÉS DE COLORATION ET DE GOÛT | [2012/52] |
Former [2007/40] | VERGORENES ALKOHOLISCHES GETRÄNK MIT AUSGEZEICHNETEM FARBNIVEAU UND GESCHMACK SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | ||
Former [2007/40] | FERMENTED ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE EXCELLENT IN COLOR LEVEL AND FLAVOR AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME | ||
Former [2007/40] | BOISSON ALCOOLIQUE FERMENTÉE PRÉSENTANT D'EXCELLENTES PROPRIÉTÉS DE COLORATION ET DE GOÛT, ET MÉTHODE DE PRODUCTION DE LADITE BOISSON | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2007 | Translation filed | 10.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/40] | 28.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.12.2005 | AT | 22.05.2013 | BE | 22.05.2013 | CY | 22.05.2013 | CZ | 22.05.2013 | DK | 22.05.2013 | EE | 22.05.2013 | FI | 22.05.2013 | IT | 22.05.2013 | LT | 22.05.2013 | LV | 22.05.2013 | MC | 22.05.2013 | NL | 22.05.2013 | PL | 22.05.2013 | RO | 22.05.2013 | SE | 22.05.2013 | SI | 22.05.2013 | SK | 22.05.2013 | TR | 22.05.2013 | BG | 22.08.2013 | GR | 23.08.2013 | ES | 02.09.2013 | IS | 22.09.2013 | PT | 23.09.2013 | IE | 16.12.2013 | LU | 16.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CY | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
TR | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
IE | 16.12.2013 | ||
LU | 16.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CY | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
IE | 16.12.2013 | ||
LU | 16.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
IE | 16.12.2013 | ||
LU | 16.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
LU | 16.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
LU | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 22.05.2013 | |
PT | 23.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4929452 (HAMDY MOSTAFA K [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0924294 (RANGEL ALDAO RAFAEL [VE], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004005381 (OKADA KINEO [JP]) [A] 1-8* the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH0937758 (SAPPORO BREWERIES); | [A]JPH10191954 (SHIKISHIMA SEIPAN KK); | [A]JP2001037462 (CERESTAR HOLDING BV); | [A]WO0204593 (SAPPORO BREWERIES [JP], et al); | [A]JP2004024151 (SAPPORO HOLDINGS LTD) |